This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2019 at 07:01:25 (UTC).

Bhonagiri v. Pandey et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Bhonagiri filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Pandey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03817

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aravind Bhonagiri

Defendants

Ravi Mhatre

Louis J. Attanasio

David Sangster

Dheeraj Pandey

Susan L. Bostrom

John McAdam

Craig Conway

Tyler Wall

Nutanix, Inc

Michael P. Scarpelli

Kenneth W. Long, III

Steven J. Gomo

Jeffrey T. Parks

Duston M. Williams

Sudheesh N. Vadakkedath

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shane Palmesano Sanders

Craig Wallace Smith

Brian J. Robbins

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF - Entered by Judge William H. Orrick in Case No. 3:19cv1651-WHO on 07/10/2019. Any application for relief from this order should be filed by 8/30/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Tyler Wall waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Susan L. Bostrom waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Sudheesh N. Vadakkedath waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Steven J. Gomo waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Ravi Mhatre waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Nutanix, Inc waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Michael P. Scarpelli waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Louis J. Attanasio waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aravind Bhonagiri. Service waived by Kenneth W. Long, III waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2019
  • Docket(#10) **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for October 30, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aravind Bhonagiri.. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Louis J. Attanasio, Susan L. Bostrom, Craig Conway, Steven J. Gomo, Kenneth W. Long, III, John McAdam, Ravi Mhatre, Nutanix, Inc, Dheeraj Pandey, Jeffrey T. Parks, David Sangster, Michael P. Scarpelli, Sudheesh N. Vadakkedath, Tyler Wall, Duston M. Williams. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/15/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Aravind Bhonagiri (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Louis J. Attanasio, Susan L. Bostrom, Craig Conway, Steven J. Gomo, Kenneth W. Long, III, John McAdam, Ravi Mhatre, Nutanix, Inc, Dheeraj Pandey, Jeffrey T. Parks, David Sangster, Michael P. Scarpelli, Sudheesh N. Vadakkedath, Tyler Wall, Duston M. Williams ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13482707.). Filed byAravind Bhonagiri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less