This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2023 at 04:29:54 (UTC).

Bharadwaj v. NYC Green Transportation Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Bharadwaj filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against NYC Green Transportation Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane Gujarati and James R. Cho. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01520

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane Gujarati

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aravind Bharadwaj

Defendants

NYC Green Transportation Group LLC

NuRide Transportation Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian Kingsley

Krishna Narine

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Philip Gottlieb

Amber Rae Will

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Chamber's Individual Rules

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 10:30 on July 8, 2021 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than July 6, 2021. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

6 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Affidavit

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14412871. by Aravind Bharadwaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Narine, Krishna) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to NYC Green Transportation Group LLC, NuRide Transportation Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14302910 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Aravind Bharadwaj. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#9

#8

#5

#3

#2

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Rae Will on behalf of NYC Green Transportation Group LLC, NuRide Transportation Group LLC (aty to be noticed) (Will, Amber) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Philip Gottlieb on behalf of NYC Green Transportation Group LLC, NuRide Transportation Group LLC (aty to be noticed) (Gottlieb, Jason) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 10:30 on July 8, 2021 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than July 6, 2021. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Krishna Narine shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/30/2021. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14412871. by Aravind Bharadwaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Narine, Krishna) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aravind Bharadwaj. All Defendants. (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to NYC Green Transportation Group LLC, NuRide Transportation Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14302910 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Aravind Bharadwaj. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less