This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2023 at 05:33:08 (UTC).

Bhambra v. Illston et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Bhambra filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Illston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harjit Bhambra

Rodeo, CA 94572

Defendants

Susan Yvonne Illston

Edward Milton Chen

U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California

Internal Revenue Service

U.S. Attorneys' Office for the Northern District of California

Cynthia Lewis Steir

Brian H. Getz In his Personal and Official Capacities as an Court Appointed Attorney doing business as Law Office of Brian H. Getz

Justin Fletcher

Brian Maguire

Nicholas Byrnes

Jimmy Greene

Baldev Singh Rahi

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Receipt

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Nicholas Byrnes, Edward Milton Chen, Justin Fletcher, Brian H. Getz, Jimmy Greene, Susan Yvonne Illston, Internal Revenue Service, Brian Maguire, Baldev Singh Rahi, Cynthia Lewis Steir, U.S. Attorneys' Office for the Northern District of California, U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Nicholas Byrnes, Edward Milton Chen, Justin Fletcher, Brian H. Getz, Jimmy Greene, Susan Yvonne Illston, Internal Revenue Service, Brian Maguire, Baldev Singh Rahi, Cynthia Lewis Steir, U.S. Attorneys' Office for the Northern District of California, U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Fraud on the Court Seeking Relief from Fabricated and Fraudulent Judgment against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt 34611162877). Filed by Harjit Bhambra. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less