This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2019 at 07:47:49 (UTC).

Beyene v. International Business Machines Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Beyene filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against International Business Machines Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tsegereda Beyene

Defendant

International Business Machines Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Smith

Attorney at Smith Law

3737 Glenwood Avenue, #100

Raleigh, NC 27612

Defendant Attorneys

Caitlin Murray Goforth

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

301 Fayetteville St., Suite 1900

Raleigh, NC 27601

Melissa R. Davis

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

3737 Glenwood Ave, Suite 450

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. This matter shall be stayed for a period of sixty (60) days from the date of entry of this Order. The time allowed for Defendant to move, serve an Answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint shall be extended to thirty (30) days after the expiration of the stay. Signed by Chief US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/20/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Extend the Time to Move, Serve an Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Melissa) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Smith on behalf of Tsegereda Beyene. (Smith, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Ryan Smith of Smith Law at 3737 Glenwood Avenue #100, Raleigh, NC 27612 mailed via US Mail on February 5, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by International Business Machines Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Davis, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Filing Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B - Amended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Business Machines Corporation from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 015654. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4814771), filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Davis, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. This matter shall be stayed for a period of sixty (60) days from the date of entry of this Order. The time allowed for Defendant to move, serve an Answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint shall be extended to thirty (30) days after the expiration of the stay. Signed by Chief US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/20/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Extend the Time to Move, Serve an Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Extend the Time to Move, Serve an Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Melissa) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Smith on behalf of Tsegereda Beyene. (Smith, Ryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Ryan Smith of Smith Law at 3737 Glenwood Avenue #100, Raleigh, NC 27612 mailed via US Mail on February 5, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - The address information in the signature block for Caitlin Murray Goforth on the notice of removal does not match the information that the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel should email the updated la firm information to the clerk's office at NCED-Attorney-Update@nced.uscourts.gov. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by International Business Machines Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Davis, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Caitlin Murray Goforth on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Goforth, Caitlin) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa R. Davis on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Davis, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Business Machines Corporation from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 015654. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4814771), filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Davis, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.