This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:30:52 (UTC).

Bey v. Randstand Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Bey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Randstand Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00396

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E'Jai Bey

Providence, RI 02907

Defendant

Randstand Corporation

 

Court Documents

5 #1

ROA

#5

(#5) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND APPELLATE COVER SHEET: Abbreviated record on appeal consisting of notice of appeal, order(s) being appealed, and a certified copy of the district court docket report transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 11.0(b). #4 Notice of Appeal. Documents Sent: 2, 4 & Order entered 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 ROA)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL by E'Jai Bey as to Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf Appeal Record due by 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by E'Jai Bey. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number IFP Pending ), filed by E'Jai Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND APPELLATE COVER SHEET: Abbreviated record on appeal consisting of notice of appeal, order(s) being appealed, and a certified copy of the district court docket report transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 11.0(b). #4 Notice of Appeal. Documents Sent: 2, 4 & Order entered 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 ROA)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL by E'Jai Bey as to Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf Appeal Record due by 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Plaintiff shall re-file his motion with the requested financial information or pay the initial filing fee of $400.00 on or before 10/26/2020. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/5/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by E'Jai Bey. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number IFP Pending ), filed by E'Jai Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by E'Jai Bey. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number IFP Pending ), filed by E'Jai Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less