This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:41:37 (UTC).

BEY v. QASIM

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by BEY against QASIM in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17171

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Michael A. Shipp

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT JACKSON III BEY

Respondent

JUDGE QASIM

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Envelope

2 #6

(#2) Letter submission from ROBERT JACKSON III BEY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jem) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

2 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ROBERT JACKSON III BEY.(abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter submission from ROBERT JACKSON III BEY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jem) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ROBERT JACKSON III BEY.(abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.