This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:28:49 (UTC).

BEY v. JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by BEY against JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17079

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Esther Salas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM HEYWARD BEY

Defendants

CHANEL JOHNSON

RONALD FUSON

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by WILLIAM HEYWARD BEY. (JB, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER, that this matter be dismissed as duplicative; and it is further Ordered that the Clerk shall close this matter. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/2/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER, that this matter be dismissed as duplicative; and it is further Ordered that the Clerk shall close this matter. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/2/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by WILLIAM HEYWARD BEY. (JB, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Document not signed by Filer. Signature needed CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.