This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:01:14 (UTC).

Betterson v. Wilcher et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Betterson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Wilcher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Travis Betterson

Savannah, GA 31405

Respondent

Sheriff John Wilcher

Not Classified By Court

Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Without Prejudice re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Travis Betterson. In forma pauperis status on appeal should likewise be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/9/20. (loh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice the 28 U.S.C. 2254 Petition and rendering moot any request for in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/6/20. (wwp) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER adopting #2 Report and Recommendations dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/5/20. (wwp) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Travis Betterson.(JH) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice the 28 U.S.C. 2254 Petition and rendering moot any request for in forma pauperis status on appeal. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/6/20. (wwp) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER adopting #2 Report and Recommendations dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/5/20. (wwp) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Without Prejudice re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Travis Betterson. In forma pauperis status on appeal should likewise be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/9/20. (loh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number SAV037324. (JH) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Travis Betterson.(JH) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.