This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 07:39:01 (UTC).

Better Mouse Company, LLC v. VTIN Technology Co., Limited

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Better Mouse Company, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against VTIN Technology Co , Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10269

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Better Mouse Company, LLC

Defendants

VTIN Technology Company, Limited

VTIN Technology Co., Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven W. Ritcheson

Attorney at Insight PLC

578 Washington Boulevard Suite 503

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni Wang and Massand PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Steven W Ritcheson

Attorney at Insight PLC

578 Washington Boulevard Suite 503

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

18 #2

Proposed Order

18 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#18

(#18) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC) #14 The document is stricken. Counsel to file a new application if appearance still desired. (jre) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in wrong case. Other error(s) with document(s): This is for case 8:20-CV-2166 DOC. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#15

(#15) Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #12 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64), #13 filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#14

(#14) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264504) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264504) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#11

(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264504) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC) #14 The document is stricken. Counsel to file a new application if appearance still desired. (jre) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in wrong case. Other error(s) with document(s): This is for case 8:20-CV-2166 DOC. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #12 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64), #13 filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264504) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264504) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264504) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant VTIN Technology Co., Limited. (esa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28926975 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Steven W. Ritcheson added to party Better Mouse Company, LLC(pty:pla))(Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Better Mouse Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hao Ni

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven W Ritcheson