This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2020 at 09:02:33 (UTC).

Bethesda Health, Inc. et al v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Bethesda Health, Inc filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-62206

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bethesda Health, Inc. doing business as Bethesda Memorial Hospital

Sarasota Memorial Hospital

Naples Community Hospital, Inc.

South Broward Hospital District doing business as Memorial Regional Hospital

1131 North 35Th Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendants

Alex M Azar, II

Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Michael Taylor

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Mark D. Polston

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Certification

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark D. Polston. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13790962 by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District. Responses due by 11/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District (Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District (Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pes) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar, II. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13783850, filed by Sarasota Memorial Hospital, Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., South Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark D. Polston. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/3/2020. (eca) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark D. Polston. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13790962 by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District. Responses due by 11/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District (Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Sarasota Memorial Hospital, South Broward Hospital District (Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pes) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar, II. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13783850, filed by Sarasota Memorial Hospital, Bethesda Health, Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., South Broward Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Taylor, J.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Bethesda Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sarasota Memorial Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where Naples Community Hospital Inc is a litigant