This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 09:37:23 (UTC).

Bethany v. Noeth

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Bethany filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Noeth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06761

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rayshawn Bethany

Attica, NY 14011

Respondent

Joseph H. Noeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Donna Milling (e-service)

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

5 #1

Petition

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Respondent shall file and serve an answer responding to the allegations in the Petition within 90 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall have 30 days after his receipt of Respondents answer or other pleading to file a written reply. The Clerk of Court shall electronically serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, via a Notice of Electronic Filing to Donna Milling. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition) Mailed a copy of this order to petitioner. (TF) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter from Rayshawn Bethany, dated 9/28/2020, to Clerk (TF) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER denying as moot Petitioner's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner has already been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See ECF No. 5. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/9/2020. A copy of this Text Order was mailed to the pro se Petitioner. (JEH) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Respondent shall file and serve an answer responding to the allegations in the Petition within 90 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall have 30 days after his receipt of Respondents answer or other pleading to file a written reply. The Clerk of Court shall electronically serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, via a Notice of Electronic Filing to Donna Milling. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition) Mailed a copy of this order to petitioner. (TF) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Rayshawn Bethany, dated 9/28/2020, to Clerk (TF) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less