This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 08:06:32 (UTC).

Betancourt-Colon v. Encanto Restaurants, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Betancourt-Colon filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Encanto Restaurants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01530

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faustino Xavier Betancourt-Colon

Defendants

Encanto Restaurants, Inc.

BPP Retail Properties LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose Carlos Velez-Colon

1969 S. Alafaya Trail #379

Orlando, FL 32828-8732

Defendant Attorneys

Natalia Marin-Catala

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges, LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918

Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Ave. Muoz Rivera, Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Paula Teresa De Felice-Alejandro

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez, LLC

P.O. Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Paula Teresa De Felice-Alejandro on behalf of Defendant BPP Retail Properties LLC.(De Felice-Alejandro, Paula) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

12 #2

Exhibit 2

12 #1

Exhibit 1

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Defendant Encanto Restaurants, Inc..(Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of BPP Retail Properties LLC (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit I

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of Encanto Restaurants, Inc. (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

6 #2

Category Sheet Category Sheet

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/10/2021. (arg) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Faustino Xavier Betancourt-Colon (Velez-Colon, Jose) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time until December 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Encanto Restaurants, Inc. filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Encanto Restaurants, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Superior Court of Bayamon, case number BY2021CV03808. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7522168), filed by Encanto Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Paula Teresa De Felice-Alejandro on behalf of Defendant BPP Retail Properties LLC.(De Felice-Alejandro, Paula) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION Submitting Certified translations of Exhibits filed in support of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Encanto Restaurants, Inc. filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Encanto Restaurants, Inc. Responses due by 12/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Defendant Encanto Restaurants, Inc..(Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of BPP Retail Properties LLC (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 28, 2021 to File Answer filed by Paula Teresa De Felice-Alejandro on behalf of BPP Retail Properties LLC Responses due by 12/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I)(De Felice-Alejandro, Paula) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of Encanto Restaurants, Inc. (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Cure Clerk's Notice of Defective Filing filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Encanto Restaurants, Inc. Responses due by 11/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Marin-Catala, Natalia) Modified on 11/10/2021 to edit event title(mcm). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/10/2021. (arg) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Faustino Xavier Betancourt-Colon (Velez-Colon, Jose) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time until December 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Encanto Restaurants, Inc. filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Encanto Restaurants, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Encanto Restaurants, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Superior Court of Bayamon, case number BY2021CV03808. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7522168), filed by Encanto Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Marin-Catala, Natalia) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalia Marin-Catala

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez