This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2019 at 08:26:02 (UTC).

Bestor v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 Bestor filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01451

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia M Bestor

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A Dalimonte

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3710 Rawlings Street, Suite 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

James F. Rogers

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

1320 Main Street, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Tracey B. Scarpello

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

40 Fountain Plaza, Suite 500

Buffalo, NY 14202

Vivian M. Quinn

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

40 Fountain Plaza, Suite 500

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J. Baughman on behalf of Patricia M Bestor (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#21

(#21) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. to E-Filing Notification, #20 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3641288.) Sponsoring Affidavit filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

20 #7

Certificate of Service

20 #6

Electronic Case Filing System Registration Form

20 #5

Attorney Database Information

20 #4

Civility Principles and Guidelines

20 #3

Attorney's Oath

20 #2

Petition for Admission to Practice

20 #1

Affidavit of Vivian M. Quinn in Support

6 #4

DKT 365

6 #1

DKT 249

5 #1

Certified Docket Sheet

#5

(#5) MULTI-DISTRICT TRANSFER ORDER under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) transferring direct-filed cases listed in Schedule B. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet) (SG) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01953. (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 10/30/2019.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16695053 filed by Patricia M Bestor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 10/30/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

195 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • (#23) TEXT ORDER re (20 in 1:19-cv-01453-LJV) MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers; (20 in 1:19-cv-01450-LJV) MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers; (20 in 1:19-cv-01451-LJV) MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers, and (20 in 1:19-cv-01452-LJV) MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, are GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/14/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01450-LJV, 1:19-cv-01451-LJV, 1:19-cv-01452-LJV, 1:19-cv-01453-LJV(CMD) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J. Baughman on behalf of Patricia M Bestor (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Verified admission to the South Carolina State Bar for Attorney James F. Rogers. (MD) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. to E-Filing Notification, #20 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3641288.) Sponsoring Affidavit filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-Filing Notification: regarding #20 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers, Esq. The Courts forms must be used or if retyped be identical. Action needed: Please complete the Sponsoring Affidavit found on our website at www.nywd.uscourts.gov and re-file using the Continuation of Exhibits event,found under Responses and Replies (MD) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to appear pro hac vice of James F. Rogers ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3641288.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Vivian M. Quinn in Support, #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines, #5 Attorney Database Information, #6 Electronic Case Filing System Registration Form, #7 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MASTER AND SHORT-FORM PLEADINGS, Main Document is DKT 249 (Attachments: #1 DKT 303-2, #2 DKT 363, #3 DKT 364, #4 DKT 365, #5 DKT 366, #6 DKT 927, #7 DKT 1108, #8 DKT 1153-1, #9 DKT 1153-2, #10 DKT 1485) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01450-LJV, 1:19-cv-01451-LJV, 1:19-cv-01452-LJV, 1:19-cv-01453-LJV(CGJ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS, Main Document is DKT 3685 (Attachments: #1 DKT 4015, #2 DKT 4016, #3 DKT 4141, #4 DKT 4311, #5 DKT 4335, #6 DKT 4866, #7 DKT 5007, #8 DKT 5285, #9 DKT 5770, #10 DKT 5881, #11 DKT 5883, #12 DKT 6227, #13 DKT 6799, #14 DKT 8113, #15 DKT 8871, #16 DKT 9415, #17 DKT 9775, #18 DKT 10323, #19 DKT 11011) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01450-LJV, 1:19-cv-01451-LJV, 1:19-cv-01452-LJV, 1:19-cv-01453-LJV(SG) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS, Main Document is DKT 248 (Attachments: #1 DKT 249, #2 DKT 314, #3 DKT 363, #4 DKT 365, #5 DKT 372, #6 DKT 401, #7 DKT 519, #8 DKT 927, #9 DKT 1108, #10 DKT 1259, #11 DKT 1319, #12 DKT 1485, #13 DKT 1662, #14 DKT 1663, #15 DKT 2238, #16 DKT 2239, #17 DKT 3214, #18 DKT 3215, #19 DKT 3372) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01450-LJV, 1:19-cv-01451-LJV, 1:19-cv-01452-LJV, 1:19-cv-01453-LJV(SG) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MULTI-DISTRICT TRANSFER ORDER under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) transferring direct-filed cases listed in Schedule B. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet) (SG) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01953. (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 10/30/2019.] (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 10/30/2019.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1953-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 10/30/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16695053 filed by Patricia M Bestor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 10/30/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less