Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:16:47 (UTC).

Bester v. Roco Real Estate LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Bester filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Roco Real Estate LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T Michael Putnam and Annemarie Carney Axon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00541

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

T Michael Putnam

Annemarie Carney Axon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isaac Bester

Defendants

Roco Real Estate LLC

Roco Management LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel P Evans

Attorney at THE EVANS LAW FIRM PC

1736 Oxmoor Road Suite 101

Birmingham, AL 35209

Daniel E Arciniegas

Attorney at ARCINIEGAS LAW PLLC

501 Union Street, Suite 501

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorney

Colin D Sherman

Attorney at SHERMAN & LACEY LLP

P.O. Box 3062

Mobile, AL 36653

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Evans, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#14

(#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/5/19. (SAC ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-541-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 7, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 7, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 am on June 5, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/24/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/24/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC.(Sherman, Colin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 4/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC. (Sherman, Colin) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Roco Management LLC served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019; Roco Real Estate LLC served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Colin D Sherman on behalf of All Defendants (Sherman, Colin) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Isaac Bester. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Isaac Bester.(MRR, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Evans, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/5/19. (SAC ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:19-cv-541-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER The telephone status conference set for Wednesday, June 5, 2019, at 10:00 AM is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 3, 2019. (TNC) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 7, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 7, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 am on June 5, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/24/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/24/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC.(Sherman, Colin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than May 24, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/26/2019. (PMA) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 4/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC. (Sherman, Colin) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Roco Management LLC served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019; Roco Real Estate LLC served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Colin D Sherman on behalf of All Defendants (Sherman, Colin) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Roco Management LLC, Roco Real Estate LLC, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3318888 (B4601096683). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Isaac Bester.(MRR, ). (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 4/10/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Isaac Bester. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Isaac Bester.(MRR, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roco Real Estate LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Roco Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin D Sherman