This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 07:46:31 (UTC).

Best v. Knouse et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Best filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Knouse. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Saporito, Jr and Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01599

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Best

Huntingdon, PA 16654

Defendants

C. Knouse

Rob

R. Scott Cramer

W. Clubert

J. Redrern

Bassem Kalada

J. Fieni

McMann

SCI-Huntingdon

Kauffman

John E. Wetzel

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER ADOPTING #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's "Complaint" (Doc. 14) is accepted as the amended complaint contemplated in the R&R (Doc. 11 at 18). This matter is REMANDED to Magistrate Judge Saporito for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/8/19. (jam) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP) filed by Ronald Best. For the foregoing reasons, it is recommended that:1.The complaint (Doc. 1) be DISMISSED in its entirety for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1), and 42 U.S.C. 1997e(c)(1);2.The plaintiff be granted leave to file an amended complaint within a specified period of time following dismissal of the original complaint; and3.This matter be remanded to the undersigned for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 10/28/2019Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/9/19. (ms) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against W. Clubert, R. Scott Cramer, J. Fieni, Bassem Kalada, C. Knouse, McMann, J. Redrern, Rob, John E. Wetzel, Kauffman, filed by Ronald Best.(ep) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#12

(#12) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER sent to Prison Superintendent/Warden to engage PLRA civil filing fee payments; (ep) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/8/19 (ms) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS NOW DEEMED FILED. Service to be held in abeyance pending screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/8/19 (ms) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#8

(#8) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

7 #1

0285

#7

(#7) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (Attachments: #1 0285)(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

6 #1

Notice of Consent

#6

(#6) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronald Best.(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION in support of plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Best. (lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis including certification by Ronald Best.(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ronald Best.(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER ADOPTING #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's "Complaint" (Doc. 14) is accepted as the amended complaint contemplated in the R&R (Doc. 11 at 18). This matter is REMANDED to Magistrate Judge Saporito for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/8/19. (jam) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against W. Clubert, R. Scott Cramer, J. Fieni, Bassem Kalada, C. Knouse, McMann, J. Redrern, Rob, John E. Wetzel, Kauffman, filed by Ronald Best.(ep) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER sent to Prison Superintendent/Warden to engage PLRA civil filing fee payments; (ep) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP) filed by Ronald Best. For the foregoing reasons, it is recommended that:1.The complaint (Doc. 1) be DISMISSED in its entirety for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1), and 42 U.S.C. 1997e(c)(1);2.The plaintiff be granted leave to file an amended complaint within a specified period of time following dismissal of the original complaint; and3.This matter be remanded to the undersigned for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 10/28/2019Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/9/19. (ms) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr to issue a report and recommendation. (jw) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/8/19 (ms) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS NOW DEEMED FILED. Service to be held in abeyance pending screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/8/19 (ms) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (Attachments: #1 0285)(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronald Best.(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION in support of plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Best. (lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ronald Best. (lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis including certification by Ronald Best.(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ronald Best.(lp) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kauffman is a litigant

Latest cases where ROB INC. DBA ROBIN'S JEAN is a litigant