This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:31:30 (UTC).

Best Center Fairfield v. Steadfast Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Best Center Fairfield filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Steadfast Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas A Danella and Anna M Manasco. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nicholas A Danella

Anna M Manasco

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Best Center Fairfield

Defendant

Steadfast Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J. Hodge

Attorney at Morris , King, and Hodge P.C.

200 Pratt Ave Ne

Huntsville, AL 35801

Joseph D Aiello

Attorney at MORRIS KING & HODGE

200 Pratt Avenue Ne

Huntsville, AL 35801

Shannon E. Loyd

Attorney at Loyd & Pollom

12703 Spectrum Drive, Suite 201

San Antonio, TX 78249

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon J. Clapp

2 North 20Th Street Ste 1405

Birmingham, AL 35203

Brandon J Clapp

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers

2 North 20Th Street Suite 1405

Birmingham, AL 35203

Frederick O Ferrand

Attorney at SWIFT CURRIE MCGHEE & HIERS

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within including: Discovery due December 9, 2022; Dispositive Motions due January 20, 2023; a joint status report is due on or before November 28, 2022; a Status Conference is set for December 5, 2022 at 11:00 a.m., by Zoom. The court will provide the Zoom information to the parties by e-mail, one week prior to the conference. This case should be trial ready by April 2023. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/10/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#15

(#15) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/10/2022. (FNC) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clapp, Brandon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#12

(#12) Case Reassigned to Judge Anna M Manasco. Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:22-cv-00054-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (DNW) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Best Center Fairfield Initial Disclosures (Loyd, Shannon) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit A

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #7

Main Document

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Clapp, Brandon) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL: You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #6

exhibit f

1 #5

exhibit e

1 #4

exhibit d

1 #3

exhibit c

1 #2

exhibit b

1 #1

exhibit a

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3994899 (B4601117970). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steadfast Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County AL, case number 68-CV-2021-900624.00 filed by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 exhibit C, # 4 exhibit D, # 5 exhibit E, # 6 exhibit F) (DNW). (Clapp, Brandon) Modified on 1/14/2022 (DNW, ). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave for Shannon Loyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #7 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/11/2022. (FNC) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-4011990 (B4601118472). (Hodge, David) Modified on 2/11/2022 (DNW, ). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within including: Discovery due December 9, 2022; Dispositive Motions due January 20, 2023; a joint status report is due on or before November 28, 2022; a Status Conference is set for December 5, 2022 at 11:00 a.m., by Zoom. The court will provide the Zoom information to the parties by e-mail, one week prior to the conference. This case should be trial ready by April 2023. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/10/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/10/2022. (FNC) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clapp, Brandon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER - The Telephone Conference set for Friday, February 11, 2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas A. Danella is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on February 9, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case Reassigned to Judge Anna M Manasco. Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:22-cv-00054-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (DNW) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference currently set for Friday, February 4, 2022 is RESET for Friday, February 11, 2022, at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Danella. The parties should dial (888) 363-4735 and enter access code 6785641 to participate in the conference. The parties are reminded that they are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than February 28, 2022. The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if all parties have submitted their elections beforehand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on January 28, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Best Center Fairfield Initial Disclosures (Loyd, Shannon) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on January 26, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-4001657 (B4601118142). (Clapp, Brandon) Modified on 1/26/2022 (DNW, ). (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Limited Admission to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clapp, Brandon) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Best Center Fairfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loyd, Shannon) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steadfast Insurance Company. filed by Steadfast Insurance Company (Clapp, Brandon) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than February 28, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after February 28, 2022. A telephone conference is hereby SET for 10:30 AM on Friday, February 4, 2022. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-363-4735 access code 6785641. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on January 14, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on January 14, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Clapp, Brandon) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3994899 (B4601117970). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steadfast Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County AL, case number 68-CV-2021-900624.00 filed by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 exhibit C, # 4 exhibit D, # 5 exhibit E, # 6 exhibit F) (DNW). (Clapp, Brandon) Modified on 1/14/2022 (DNW, ). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL: You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steadfast Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County AL, case number 68-CV-2021-900624.00 filed by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Attachments: #1 exhibit A, #2 exhibit B, #3 exhibit C, #4 exhibit D, #5 exhibit E, #6 exhibit F) (DNW) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Justin Clapp

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Owen Ferrand