This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2021 at 08:08:47 (UTC).

Bessing v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Bessing filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Property Casualty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth E Foote and Mark L Hornsby. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-02959

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Bessing

Defendant

United Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Austin Marks

Attorney at Morris Bart (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2400

New Orleans, LA 70130-6036

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney Lehan Fournet

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Virginia J McLin

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Christopher K Jones

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JUDGMENT granting #12 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/20/2021. (crt,Keifer, K) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co, David Bessing. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified on 10/20/2021 to add filer and modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2021 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/13/2021. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/20/2021. Rule 26 Report due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/15/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co.(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/3/2021. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice to Adverse Parties, #4 Notice of Compliance)(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified docket text on 9/3/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM ORDER. United Property must file, no later than September 15, 2021, an amended notice of removal that specifically alleges the state in which Plaintiff is domiciled. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/30/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/27/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, United Property & Casualty Insurance Co answer due 9/13/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant, United Property & Casualty Insurance Company be granted an additional thirty (30) days from the date a responsive pleading would otherwise be due, through September 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/27/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/27/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 631568, Div. C (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4794815) filed by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice to Adverse Parties, #5 Notice of Compliance)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party United Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard William Wolff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher K. Jones