This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2020 at 06:29:32 (UTC).

Beshures v. East Manufacturing Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Beshures filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against East Manufacturing Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher M. Beshures

Defendant

East Manufacturing Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward J. Smith, III

Attorney at Smith, Sovik, Kendrick & Sugnet, P.C. - Syracuse Office

250 South Clinton Street, Suite 600

Syracuse, NY 13202-1252

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth M. Alweis

Attorney at Goldberg, Segalla Law Firm - Syracuse Office

5786 Widewaters Parkway

Syracuse, NY 13214

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 11:30 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - State Court Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Oswego County, case number EFC-2020-0125 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5018354) filed by East Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for East Manufacturing Corporation answer due 2/14/2020. (see) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 11:30 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Oswego County, case number EFC-2020-0125 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5018354) filed by East Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward J. Smith, III