This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:49 (UTC).

BERTUCA v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BERTUCA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon, Doris L. Pryor, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04831

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James Patrick Hanlon

Richard L. Young

Referral Judges

Doris L. Pryor

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH BERTUCA

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Michael Langevin

Attorney at MCSWEENEY/LANGEVIN

2116 Second Avenue South

Minneapolis, MN 55404

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James Patrick Hanlon, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/12/2019.(LBT) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORTED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04477-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04551-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04552-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04556-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04599-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04626-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04629-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04631-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04633-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04634-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04660-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04680-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04704-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04705-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04706-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04707-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04708-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04709-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04727-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04734-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04742-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04743-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04749-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04764-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04765-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04769-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04771-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04772-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04774-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04778-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04779-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04794-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04797-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04806-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04839-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04841-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04844-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04848-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#8

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORTED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04477-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04551-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04552-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04556-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04599-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04626-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04629-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04631-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04633-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04634-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04660-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04680-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04704-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04705-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04706-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04707-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04708-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04709-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04727-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04734-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04742-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04743-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04749-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04764-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04765-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04769-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04771-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04772-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04774-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04778-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04779-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04794-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04797-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04806-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04839-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04841-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04844-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04848-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Langevin on behalf of Plaintiff ELIZABETH BERTUCA. (Langevin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ELIZABETH BERTUCA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756586) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langevin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORTED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04477-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04551-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04552-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04556-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04599-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04626-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04629-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04631-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04633-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04634-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04660-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04680-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04704-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04705-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04706-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04707-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04708-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04709-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04727-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04734-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04742-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04743-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04749-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04764-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04765-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04769-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04771-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04772-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04774-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04778-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04779-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04794-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04797-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04806-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04839-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04841-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04844-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04848-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORTED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04477-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04551-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04552-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04556-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04599-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04626-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04629-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04631-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04633-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04634-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04660-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04680-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04704-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04705-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04706-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04707-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04708-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04709-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04727-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04734-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04742-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04743-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04749-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04764-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04765-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04769-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04771-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04772-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04774-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04778-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04779-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04794-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04797-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04806-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04839-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04841-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04844-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04848-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#6) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:19-cv-04818-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04838-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 12/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04818-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04819-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04825-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04827-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04838-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/12/2019.(LBT) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James Patrick Hanlon, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-04831-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Langevin on behalf of Plaintiff ELIZABETH BERTUCA. (Langevin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ELIZABETH BERTUCA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756586) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langevin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less