This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2020 at 10:34:59 (UTC).

Michelle A. Bertone v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 Michelle A Bertone filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10393

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle A. Bertone

Defendants

Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Omar Ortega

Attorney at Pierre Pierre Law PC

211 East 43Rd Street Suite 608

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Francesco P Benavides

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/22/2020. (dc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michelle A. Bertone, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to B. Saefong. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 summons executed with proof of service)(Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/22/2020. (dc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Benavides, Francesco) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to DFT Andrew Saul. (dc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Michelle A. Bertone. (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Michelle A. Bertone, (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michelle A. Bertone. (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michelle A. Bertone. (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Michelle A. Bertone. (Attorney Omar Ortega added to party Michelle A. Bertone(pty:pla))(Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.