This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 19:01:58 (UTC).

Bertoli v Amerisave Mortgage Corportation

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 Bertoli filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Amerisave Mortgage Corportation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10900

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amerisave Mortgage Corporation d/b/a Amerisave Wholesale Mortgage Solutions

9721 Ormsby Station Road, Suite 107

Louisville, KY 40223

Mr Paul Bertoli

Defendant

Amerisave Mortgage Corporation doing business as Amerisave Wholesale Mortgage Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Efpraxia P. Salpoglou

Attorney at Law Office of E. Pamela Salpoglou

One Cabot Place, Suite 1

Stoughton, MA 02072

Defendant Attorney

Stephen J. Orlando

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

21 Custom House Street, 5Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

CategoryForm4-4-11

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Affidavit

#6

#8

#9

#10

#12

12 #1

Exhibit Answer to Complaint

#14

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. (Orlando, Stephen) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Renewed Motion to Set Aside Default. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Set Aside Default Renewed by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Complaint)(Orlando, Stephen) (Entered: 07/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #10 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Request For Oral Argument by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. Motion denied without prejudice to it's renewal within seven days of the date of this order supported by the proposed answer which must detail the "meritorious defenses" the defendant claims to have. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default and Request For Oral Argument by Amerisave Mortgage Corporation.(Orlando, Stephen) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Amerisave Mortgage Corporation (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Entry of Default (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Paul Bertoli re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Amerisave Mortgage Corporation . (Salpoglou, Efpraxia) Modified on 7/13/2021 to Correct Docket Text (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Amerisave Mortgage Corporation by Paul Bertoli. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Salpoglou, Efpraxia) Modified on 7/13/2021 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Paul Bertoli. Amerisave Mortgage Corporation served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. Acknowledgment filed by Paul Bertoli. (Salpoglou, Efpraxia) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Paul Bertoli against Amerisave Mortgage Corporation d/b/a Amerisave Wholesale Mortgage Solutions Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8797370 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Paul Bertoli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CategoryForm4-4-11)(Salpoglou, Efpraxia) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation is a litigant