This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 08:27:51 (UTC).

Berryanne et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Berryanne filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory A. Presnell and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01716

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rachid Berryanne

Naima Khales-Berryanne

Defendants

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shahzad Ahmed

Attorney at Brink Ahmed Immigration

5401 S. Kirkman Rd., Suite. 105

Orlando, FL 32819

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Attorney. (LDJ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rachid Berryanne, Naima Khales-Berryanne Related case(s): No (Ahmed, Shahzad) Modified text on 11/1/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Rachid Berryanne, Naima Khales-Berryanne. (Ahmed, Shahzad) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/20/2021. (DS) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants (No summons received for U.S. Attorney or U.S. Attorney General). (RDO) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rachid Berryanne, Naima Khales-Berryanne. (RDO) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rachid Berryanne, Naima Khales-Berryanne. Related case(s): No (RDO) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number. ORL100698 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shahzad Ahmed