This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 13:57:10 (UTC).

Berry v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Berry filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Yarbrough and Jerry H. Ritter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00643

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

Presiding Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edward J. Berry, Jr.

Edward J. Berry

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Houliston

Attorney at The Law Offices of David M Houliston

7500 Jefferson Street Ne, Suite 106

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-228) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria (MDL 2741). (kg) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward J. Berry. Monsanto Company served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#3

(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Edward J. Berry (Houliston, David) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Edward J. Berry, Jr. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-228) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria (MDL 2741). (kg) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward J. Berry. Monsanto Company served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (arp) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Edward J. Berry (Houliston, David) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7192643 re #1 Complaint filed by Edward J. Berry, Jr. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Houliston, David) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Edward J. Berry, Jr. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Houliston