This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:24:00 (UTC).

Berry v. Marshall et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Berry filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Marshall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01070

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kevin Berry

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Respondents

Attorney General for the State of Delaware

Dr. Robert Marsh

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Letter to Kevin Berry, from Clerk's Office, in response to D.I. #4 Letter. (amf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter to the Court, from Kevin Berry, enclosing $5 filing fee and requesting copy of docket sheet. (amf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Letter to Kevin Berry from Clerk's Office regarding Check Return and One Free Docket Sheet. (apk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A-K

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No IFP. No Filing Fee Paid) - filed by Kevin Berry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(mal) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Kevin Berry, from Clerk's Office, in response to D.I. #4 Letter. (amf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketRemark: $5 filing fee paid on 9/4/2020. Receipt number DEX034235. (amf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter to the Court, from Kevin Berry, enclosing $5 filing fee and requesting copy of docket sheet. (amf) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Kevin Berry from Clerk's Office regarding Check Return and One Free Docket Sheet. (apk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No IFP. No Filing Fee Paid) - filed by Kevin Berry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(mal) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less