This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2019 at 07:48:00 (UTC).

Berry v. Kroger Texas LP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 Berry filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Texas LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02400

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berlinda Berry

Defendant

Kroger Texas LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David B Koch

Attorney at The Law Offices of Tim O'Hare

1038 S. Elm Street

Carrollton, TX 75006

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Kimbrough Scudday

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

B Kyle Briscoe

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 12/9/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020. Motions due by 8/30/2020. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 9/27/2020. Settlement Status Report due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 11/18/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/6/2019) (axm) Modified on 11/20/2019 (chmb). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Kuehler, Anthony) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/16/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroger Texas L.P.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-13656 filed by Kroger Texas L.P.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10329673) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 12/9/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020. Motions due by 8/30/2020. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 9/27/2020. Settlement Status Report due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 11/18/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/6/2019) (axm) Modified on 11/20/2019 (chmb). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Kuehler, Anthony) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/16/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroger Texas L.P.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-13656 filed by Kroger Texas L.P.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10329673) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara Kimbrough Scudday

Latest cases represented by Lawyer B Kyle Briscoe