This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2019 at 08:44:28 (UTC).

BERRIOS v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 BERRIOS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03895

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELO BERRIOS

Defendant

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN

Attorney at ZENSTEIN KOVALSKY BUCKALEW LLC

1240 Old York Road,, Suite 101

Warminster, PA 18974

Defendant Attorneys

YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO

Attorney at BENNETT, BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG

960 Harvest Dr, Bldg B Ste 100

Blue Bell, PA 19422

WILLIAM HOFMANN

Attorney at BENNETT BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG LLC

960 Harvest Dr, Building B Suite 100

Blue Bell, PA 19422-1900

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/8/2020 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(kp, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANGELO BERRIOS. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

4 #3

Certificate of Service

4 #2

Exhibit

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with And Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM HOFMANN on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by DEFT STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheets

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certification of Counsel, Certificate of Service, case number 190701590., (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE202751) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • (#7) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/8/2020 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(kp, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANGELO BERRIOS. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with And Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM HOFMANN on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by DEFT STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEFT STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (kw, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certification of Counsel, Certificate of Service, case number 190701590., (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE202751) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William H Hofmann(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO