This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:35:04 (UTC).

Berrios-Correa v. MAPFRE

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Berrios-Correa filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAPFRE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02105

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Raquel Berrios

MAPFRE

Raquel Berrios-Correa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pedro R. Vazquez, III

Attorney at Pedro R. Vazquez Law Office

405 Esmeralda Ave. Suite 2, Pmb 153

Guaynabo, PR 00969

Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla

Attorney at Sanchez Betances, Sifre & Muoz Noya, C.S.P.

P.O. Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear AND REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD filed by Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla on behalf of MAPFRE Responses due by 2/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Bonilla, Nuyen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MAPFRE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

1 #3

Summons SUMMONS

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #1

Category Sheet CATEGORY SHEET

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MAPFRE ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6702093.), filed by Raquel Berrios. Service due by 3/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet CATEGORY SHEET, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Summons SUMMONS)(Vazquez, III, Pedro) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear AND REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD filed by Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla on behalf of MAPFRE Responses due by 2/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Bonilla, Nuyen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to MAPFRE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MAPFRE ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6702093.), filed by Raquel Berrios. Service due by 3/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet CATEGORY SHEET, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Summons SUMMONS)(Vazquez, III, Pedro) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less