This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:07:37 (UTC).

BERNIER et al v 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by BERNIER against 3M COMPANY in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03214

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

M CASEY RODGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSHUA BROWN

JOHN LONDON

HARRISON BERNIER

LESLIE RYAN

JEFFREY HAWK

DANIEL KOOGLER

GRANT ROSS

ARTHUR WIEGELE

BRUCE WHERRY

Defendant

3M COMPANY

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#11

(#11) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. GORDON FISHER, ROBIN FLANERY, JEFFREY HAWK, DANIEL KOOGLER, JOHN LONDON, GRANT ROSS, LESLIE RYAN, JASON TUCKER, BRUCE WHERRY, ARTHUR WIEGELE, JOSHUA BROWN and DENNIS CAMBILLO terminated. (djb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02160. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. Aearo LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2019)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7062802) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2019)

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. GORDON FISHER, ROBIN FLANERY, JEFFREY HAWK, DANIEL KOOGLER, JOHN LONDON, GRANT ROSS, LESLIE RYAN, JASON TUCKER, BRUCE WHERRY, ARTHUR WIEGELE, JOSHUA BROWN and DENNIS CAMBILLO terminated. (djb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02160. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. Aearo LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean R. Cooper, Franklin D. Azar, Sean O. McCrary, John Friedberg as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2160 JRT/DTS. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7062802) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.