This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2020 at 09:39:16 (UTC).

Bernard v. Omega Protein Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Bernard filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Omega Protein Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J Hanna and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01301

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roland Bernard, Jr

Jarrian Baudoin

Roland Bernard, III

Defendants

Alpha VesselCo L L C

Omega Protein Inc

X Y Z Insurance Co

Jeb Morgan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darleen M Jacobs

Attorney at Law Office of Darleen M Jacobs

823 St Louis St

New Orleans, LA 70112

John Leslie Young

Attorney at Law Office of John L Young

823 St Louis St

New Orleans, LA 70112

Al Ambrose Sarrat

Attorney at Law Office of Darleen M Jacobs

823 St Louis St

New Orleans, LA 70112

Rene Daniel Lovelace, I

Attorney at Law Office of Darleen M Jacobs

823 St Louis St

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorney

Alan K Breaud

Attorney at Breaud & Meyers

P O Box 51365

Lafayette, LA 70505

 

Court Documents

#55

#54

#53

52 #3

Proposed order

52 #2

Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1 Rule 7 Certificate

#52

50 #2

Proposed order

50 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#50

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #3

Summons Omega Protein

1 #2

Summons Alpha VesselCo LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim all Claims against Captain Jeb Morgan filed by Jarrian Baudoin, Roland Bernard, Jr, Roland Bernard, III. (aty,Jacobs, Darleen) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT against Alpha VesselCo L L C, Jeb Morgan, X Y Z Insurance Co filed by Roland Bernard, III, Jarrian Baudoin.(crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER granting #52 Motion to Amend/Correct {1} Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/19/2020. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION to Amend Complaint with consent by Roland Bernard, Jr. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1 Rule 7 Certificate, #3 Proposed order, #4 Proposed pleading)(aty,Jacobs, Darleen) Modified on 11/13/2020 to modify motion event to more accurately describe pleading. (Crick, S). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim all Claims against Captain Jeb Morgan. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim all Claims against Captain Jeb Morgan by Jeb Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Alan K Breaud added to party Jeb Morgan(pty:dft))(aty,Breaud, Alan) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeb Morgan, X Y Z Insurance Co. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT against Alpha VesselCo L L C, Jeb Morgan, X Y Z Insurance Co filed by Roland Bernard, Jr.(crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting #46 Motion to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/22/2020. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint with opposition by Roland Bernard, Jr. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Rule 7 Certificate, #3 Proposed order, #4 Proposed pleading)(aty,Jacobs, Darleen) Modified on 10/21/2020 to capture more accurate motion event, create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response to Order to Show Cause, #9 Response to Order to Show Cause>**Documents filed in wrong case. Both documents are captioned for the Western District of Louisiana.** (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **FILED IN WRONG CASE/DISTRICT**RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Roland Bernard, Jr re #7 Order, #8 Response to Order to Show Cause (Jacobs, Darleen) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **FILED IN WRONG CASE/DISTRICT**RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Roland Bernard, Jr re #7 Order, (Jacobs, Darleen) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: ORDERED that the call docket is satisfied. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 03/27/2020, plaintiff shall obtain responsive pleadings or preliminary defaults on the served defendant. Failure to do so will result in the defendant's dismissal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/14/2020.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Omega Protein served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Jacobs, Darleen) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Alpha VesselCo LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Jacobs, Darleen) (Main Document 5 replaced with correct PDF of summons on 2/4/2020) (clw). Modified text on 2/4/2020 (clw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that on or before FEBRUARY 14, 2020, plaintiffs shall file into the record the returns of service of process that have been effected on defendants. Failure to do so will result in the DISMISSAL of the unserved defendants without further notice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/16/2020.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Alpha VesselCo LLC, Omega Protein. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Alpha VesselCo LLC, Omega Protein. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7853858) filed by Roland Bernard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Alpha VesselCo LLC, #3 Summons Omega Protein)Attorney John Leslie Young added to party Roland Bernard, Jr(pty:pla).(Young, John) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alpha Vesselco, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan K Breaud(Designation Retained)