This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 09:13:09 (UTC).

Bernard v. Humphres et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Bernard filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Humphres. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-02111

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddison Bernard

Defendants

Perry Allen Humphres

Broken Arrow Transport Inc

TCS Leasing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Andrew Bowen

Attorney at Bowen Painter LLC

Po Box 15008

Savannah, GA 31416

D Josev Brewer

Attorney at The Law Office of D Josev Brewer

650 E Washington Street

Greenville, SC 29601

Gini Lynn Jenkins

Attorney at Bowen Painter

7302 Abercorn Street, Suite 3

Savannah, GA 31406

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Quintin Atkinson

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

Aaron Jameson Hayes

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1-State Court Documents

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Broken Arrow Transport Inc, Perry Allen Humphres, TCS Leasing Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Broken Arrow Transport Inc, Perry Allen Humphres, TCS Leasing Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Supporting Documents

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eddison Bernard.(Bowen, William) (Entered: 07/17/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Application/Affidavit

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by D Josev Brewer on behalf of Eddison Bernard (Brewer, D) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#12

(#12) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/15/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/11/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/2/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/22/2022, Discovery due by 1/23/2023, Motions due by 2/6/2023, Mediation Due by 2/21/2023, Motion in Limine due by 3/22/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/31/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/21/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/25/22. (alew, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Monday, August 29, 2022 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/25/22. (alew, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Quintin Atkinson on behalf of Broken Arrow Transport Inc, Perry Allen Humphres, TCS Leasing Inc (Atkinson, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ENTRY: Phone conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit joint responses to Local Civil Rule 26.03(A)(1-4) (D.S.C.) interrogatories within 14 days. (alew, ) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Quintin Atkinson on behalf of Broken Arrow Transport Inc, Perry Allen Humphres, TCS Leasing Inc (Atkinson, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Monday, August 29, 2022 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/25/22. (alew, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/15/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/11/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/2/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/22/2022, Discovery due by 1/23/2023, Motions due by 2/6/2023, Mediation Due by 2/21/2023, Motion in Limine due by 3/22/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/31/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/21/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/25/22. (alew, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by D Josev Brewer on behalf of Eddison Bernard (Brewer, D) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gini Lynn Jenkins for Eddison Bernard. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/21/22.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gini Lynn Jenkins ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10597197) by Eddison Bernard. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bowen, William) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/20/2022) (alew, ). Modified on 7/20/2022 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2022: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing) (alew, ). Modified on 7/20/2022 to add document provided by filing user.(alew, ). (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eddison Bernard.(Bowen, William) (Entered: 07/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Hayes, Aaron) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (7/19/22). (alew, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Broken Arrow Transport Inc, Perry Allen Humphres, TCS Leasing Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Broken Arrow Transport Inc, Perry Allen Humphres, TCS Leasing Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-42-01965. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10572542), filed by Broken Arrow Transport Inc, Perry Allen Humphres, TCS Leasing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Steven Barrow