This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2023 at 06:11:20 (UTC).

In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 In Re Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-09911

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

Abu Dhabi Investment Authority

In Re and Debtor

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Appellee

Irving H. Picard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Daniel M. Kelly

Eric M. Kay

Marc Laurence Greenwald

Appellee Attorneys

Alexa D'Angelo

Eric Brandon Hiatt

Keith R. Murphy

Anat Maytal

David J. Sheehan

Kim Marie Longo

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Exhibit A - Public Institution for Social Security v. Picard (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 20,

#18

(#18) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Marc L. Greenwald dated September 21, 2023 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Institution for Social Security v. Picard (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 20, 2023)).(Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

17 #1

Exhibit A - Transcript of 8/31/2023 Hearing Before Judge Woods in 22-cv-8741

#17

(#17) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Marc L. Greenwald dated September 12, 2023 re: Response to Trustee's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of 8/31/2023 Hearing Before Judge Woods in 22-cv-8741).(Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#16

(#16) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Kim M. Longo dated 09/06/2023 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Longo, Kim) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#15

(#15) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority..(Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#14

(#14) Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/10/2023..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Appellee's opposition brief shall be filed and served no later than April 26, 2023; and 2. Appellant's reply brief shall be filed and served no later than June 2, 2023. SO ORDERED. ( Appellant Reply Brief due by 6/2/2023., Appellee Brief due by 4/26/2023.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/17/2023) (ate) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

11 #4

Appendix (Joint) Part 4

11 #2

Appendix (Joint) Part 2

#5

(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kim Marie Longo on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Longo, Kim) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-8741. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority..(bkar) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Decision

1 #1

Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Marc L. Greenwald dated September 21, 2023 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Institution for Social Security v. Picard (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 20, 2023)).(Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Marc L. Greenwald dated September 12, 2023 re: Response to Trustee's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of 8/31/2023 Hearing Before Judge Woods in 22-cv-8741).(Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Kim M. Longo dated 09/06/2023 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Longo, Kim) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority..(Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/10/2023..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Appellee's opposition brief shall be filed and served no later than April 26, 2023; and 2. Appellant's reply brief shall be filed and served no later than June 2, 2023. SO ORDERED. ( Appellant Reply Brief due by 6/2/2023., Appellee Brief due by 4/26/2023.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/17/2023) (ate) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority. Appellee Brief due by 2/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Joint) Part 1, #2 Appendix (Joint) Part 2, #3 Appendix (Joint) Part 3, #4 Appendix (Joint) Part 4, #5 Appendix (Joint) Part 5, #6 Appendix (Joint) Part 6, #7 Appendix (Joint) Part 7, #8 Appendix (Joint) Part 8, #9 Appendix (Joint) Part 9, #10 Appendix (Joint) Part 10, #11 Appendix (Joint) Part 11, #12 Appendix (Joint) Part 12, #13 Appendix (Special Appendix)).(Greenwald, Marc) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Appellant's opening brief shall be filed and served no later than January 25, 2023; 2. Appellee's opposition brief shall be filed and served no later than March 27, 2023; and 3. Appellant's reply brief shall be filed and served no later than April 26, 2023. ( Appellant Brief due by 1/25/2023., Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/26/2023., Appellee Brief due by 3/27/2023.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/5/2023) (ate) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 1/27/2023..(bkar) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kim Marie Longo on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Longo, Kim) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 22-cv-8741 and declined by Judge Gregory H. Woods and returned to wheel for assignment. (aea) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-8741. Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority..(bkar) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 22-8741. (bkar) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated November 16, 2022. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 11-2493A, 08-1789A (CGM). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Abu Dhabi Investment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order, #2 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Decision).(bkar) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less