This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 06:43:50 (UTC).

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC et al v. Picard

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Picard. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08678

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Appellants

Barbara Keller

Gerald E. Keller

The Gerald and Barbara Keller Family Trust

In Re and Debtor

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Appellee

Irving H. Picard

Intervenor

Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Helen Davis Chaitman

Appellee Attorneys

Marie L Carlisle

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal

Tracy Lynn Cole

Nicholas J. Cremona

Intervenor Attorneys

Kevin H. Bell

Nicholas G. Hallenbeck

Kenneth J. Caputo

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Bankruptcy Court's decision below is AFFIRMED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this matter. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/6/2022) (ate) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#25

(#25) LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Helen Davis Chaitman dated October 5, 2022 re: Requesting a correction of the Courts September 30,2022 Opinion and Order respecting the parties to this appeal. Document filed by Barbara Keller, Gerald E. Keller, The Gerald and Barbara Keller Family Trust..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

24 #1

Right to Appeal

24 #24

Main Document

#23

(#23) OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Bankruptcy Court's decision below is AFFIRMED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this matter. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/30/2022) (ate) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/30/2022)

22 #1

Exhibit A - JABA Second Circuit Decision

22 #22

Main Document

18 #4

Exhibit Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

18 #2

Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Vanderwal, Amy) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This bankruptcy appeal has been assigned to me for all purposes. The briefing schedule provided in the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures, specifically in Rule 8018, governs this case. The parties are advised that oral argument will not be held unless and until the Court orders otherwise. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/10/2021) (tg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 12/22/2021..(bkar) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Irving H. Picard..(bkar) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

3 #1

Statement of Issues

3 #3

Main Document

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Bankruptcy Court's decision below is AFFIRMED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this matter. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/6/2022) (ate) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Helen Davis Chaitman dated October 5, 2022 re: Requesting a correction of the Courts September 30,2022 Opinion and Order respecting the parties to this appeal. Document filed by Barbara Keller, Gerald E. Keller, The Gerald and Barbara Keller Family Trust..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #23 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Irving H. Picard against The Gerald and Barbara Keller Family Trust, Barbara Keller, Gerald E. Keller. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated September 30, 2022, the Bankruptcy Court's decision is AFFIRMED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/30/2022) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Bankruptcy Court's decision below is AFFIRMED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this matter. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/30/2022) (ate) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Seanna R. Brown dated September 27, 2022 re: JABA Second Circuit Decision. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - JABA Second Circuit Decision).(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Amy E. Vanderwal dated February 23, 2022 re: Recent District Court Decision. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decision).(Vanderwal, Amy) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Gerald E. Keller, The Gerald and Barbara Keller Family Trust..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Nicholas G. Hallenbeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) MOTION for Nicholas G. Hallenbeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bernstein Order, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Hallenbeck Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Hallenbeck, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tracy Lynn Cole on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Cole, Tracy) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Vanderwal, Amy) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER: This bankruptcy appeal has been assigned to me for all purposes. The briefing schedule provided in the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures, specifically in Rule 8018, governs this case. The parties are advised that oral argument will not be held unless and until the Court orders otherwise. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/10/2021) (tg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 12/22/2021..(bkar) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Irving H. Picard..(bkar) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellants Barbara Keller, Gerald E. Keller, The Gerald and Barbara Keller Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues).(bkar) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated September 30, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4539A, 08-1789A. Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Barbara Keller, The Gerald and Barbara Keller Family Trust, Gerald E. Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(bkar) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less