This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2021 at 08:21:16 (UTC).

Bernal v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Bernal filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08014

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Maria Bernal

Bellflower, CA 90707

Defendants

Eve R. Berg

Joanne Person

Mirjana Nichiporuk Tolt

Jacquelyn Phillips Lacey

Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc.

Jay-Z

United States of America

Kamala Harris

Douglas Emhoff

Attorney General of the United States

George H. Wu

Scott Harris

Chris Sawyer

Providence Health and Services doing business as Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance doing business as Providence Little Company of Mary

Providence St. Joseph Health

Providence Health System Southern California

Brady Joseph Mitchell

Gary Olney an individual doing business as Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance

Gary Olney a CEO doing business as Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance

282 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa Maria Bernal re Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,, Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60),,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,, #11 (mrgo) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#21

(#21) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa Maria Bernal re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #8 (mrgo) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#19

(#19) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa Maria Bernal re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 (mrgo) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#17

(#17) 16TH EMERGENCY ORDER for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction; New Contemp of Court Facts Under Oath; Order to Add New Defendants; Order Granting Further Award Items With Prejudice; Order to Transfer Debt filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#15

(#15) 15TH EMERGENCY ORDER FOR FEDERAL RESTRAINING AND INJUNCTION ORDER AND ADDITIONAL NEW FACTS UNDER OATH AND ORDER TO INCLUDE DOCUMENTS IN PREVIOUS CASE AND ORDER TO UPDATE MAILING ADDRESS filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#13

#11

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Order to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs

5 #5

Main Document

#4

#2

1 #3

Order for US Marshall Service and Cost of Copies

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa Maria Bernal re Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,, Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60),,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,, #11 (mrgo) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa Maria Bernal re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #8 (mrgo) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa Maria Bernal re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 (mrgo) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiffs most recent filing #17 , styled as "16th Emergency Order for a Temporary Restraining Order," is, like Plaintiffs previous submissions, incomprehensible and fails to state any plausible claim to relief. Accordingly, it is denied. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) 16TH EMERGENCY ORDER for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction; New Contemp of Court Facts Under Oath; Order to Add New Defendants; Order Granting Further Award Items With Prejudice; Order to Transfer Debt filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: 15TH EMERGENCY ORDER FOR FEDERAL RESTRAINING AND INJUNCTION ORDER AND ADDITIONAL NEW FACTS UNDER OATH AND ORDER TO INCLUDE DOCUMENTS IN PREVIOUS CASE AND ORDER TO UPDATE MAILING ADDRESS filed by plaintiff #15 - Plaintiffs most recent filing #15 is yet another request for an Emergency Order and Injunction Order. Like Plaintiffs previous submissions, this 189-page filing neither states any plausible claim for relief nor is intelligible. Accordingly, it is denied. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) 15TH EMERGENCY ORDER FOR FEDERAL RESTRAINING AND INJUNCTION ORDER AND ADDITIONAL NEW FACTS UNDER OATH AND ORDER TO INCLUDE DOCUMENTS IN PREVIOUS CASE AND ORDER TO UPDATE MAILING ADDRESS filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - Though captioned as a Request for Federal Injunction, Plaintiffs filing in #13 does not appear to request any actual relief or action by this Court. To the extent it does, it is denied as it is unintelligible. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR FEDERAL INJUNCTION, ORDER TO CORRECT INFORMATION ON PREVIOUS INJUNCTION, ADDITIONAL NEW FACTS UNDER OATH, AND ORDER TO CORRECT INFORMATION ON ORDER TO COMPEL CRIMINAL PROSECUTION OF ALL DEFENDANT CLERKS AND ALL DEFENDANTS filed by Plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (lom) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF UPDATE OF LIVING LOCATION AND NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL FACTS OF CONTEMPT OF COURT COMMITTED BY ALL DEFENDANTS, MADE UNDER OATH filed by Plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (lom) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EMERGENCY ORDER TO COMPEL CRIMINAL PROSECUTION OF ALL DEFENDANT CLERKS AND ALL-CO-DEFENDANTS filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EMERGENCY ORDER FOR FEDERAL INJUNCTION, ORDER TO CORRECT LOCATION AND CORRECT NAME OF JUDGE TO CJC AND TO ADD MORE DEFENDANTS filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Order to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EMERGENCY ORDER for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants AT and T Corp, Advance Magazine Publishers, Inc, All Police Teamsters Unions in Arizona, All Police Teamsters Unions in California, All Police Teamsters Unions in Multi-State, Kurt G Alme(a corrupt public employee), Kurt G Alme(an individual), Amazon Advertising, LLC, Amazon Data Services, Inc., Amazon Goog, Inc, Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Services LLC, Anonymous Organization, Darren Arakawa(an individual), Darren Arakawa(corrupt cop), Arizona Coconino County Health and Human Services, Arizona Department of Health Services, Arizonia Department of Public Safety, Janelle Desiree Arriaga, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Attorney General of Arizona, Attorney General of California, Attorney General of Montana, Attorney General of Nevada, Attorney General of Oregon, Attorney General of South Carolina, Attorney General of Washington, Attorney General of Washington D.C., Attorney General of the United States, Cynthia Bahena, Thalia Bartnett, Darlene Beamon-Thomas(an individual), Darlene Beamon-Thomas(corrupt public official), Stephanie Bedi(public official), Stephanie Bedi(an individual), Stephanie Bedi(a corrupt attorney ), Sosse Bedrossian(an individual), Sosse Bedrossian(a corrupt public official), Sosse Bedrossian(RN), Jessica Bentley(a corrupt public employee), Jessica Bentley(an individual), Eve R. Berg(corrupt cop), Eve R. Berg(an individual), Micah Lynn Berul(an individual), Micah Lynn Berul(corrupt attorney), Todd Anthony Brisco(an attorney), Todd Anthony Brisco(an individual), Juana Brown (corrupt cop), Juana Brown (an individual), Kathy Nguyen Buby(an individual), Kathy Nguyen Buby(RN), California Board of Registered Nursing, California Department of Fair and Equal Housing, California Department of Health and Human Services, California Department of Public Health, California Firefighter Unions in Arizona, California Firefighter Unions in California, California Firefighter Unions in Multi-State, California Nurses Association National Nurses Organinzing, California State University, Rosanna Jessica Camargo Coban(RN), Rosanna Jessica Camargo Coban(an individual), Hannah Campos(corrupt cop), Hannah Campos(an individual), Israel Campos, Alex Caputo-Pearl(a corrupt labor rep), Alex Caputo-Pearl(an individual), Bonnie Castillo(a corrupt labor exec), Bonnie Castillo(RN), Bonnie Castillo(an individual), Robert A Chapek, Chino, Anne Chow, Christian Schank and Associates, a Professional Corporation, Church of Scientology, Scott Ciesielski(an individual), Scott Ciesielski(CNO), City Rancho Palos Verdes, City of Covina, City of Downey, City of El Paso, City of Flagstaff, City of Lynwood, City of Norwalk, City of Paramount, City of South Gate, City of Torrance, City of West Covina, Kristen Clarke(in her official capacity as DOJ), Kristen Clarke(as an individual), Tamara Cleveland(a corrupt public health nurse), Tamara Cleveland(an individual), Coconino County, Coconino County Flagstaff Justice Court, Coconino County Health Department, Coconino County Jail, Jonathan Collier, Chrisie Collins(a corrupt public official), Chrisie Collins(an individual), Comcast Corporation, Linda Connor(an individual), Linda Connor(a corrupt public official), Steve Cooper, County of Los Angeles, Covenant Health Network, Inc, Covina Police Department, Cushman and Wakefield of California, Inc., Marissa Barinque Dagdagan(an individual), Marissa Barinque Dagdagan(a corrupt attorney), Marissa Barinque Dagdagan(a corrupt public official), Randall Davis(an individual), Randall Davis(corrupt cop), Michael D Deal, Department of Children and Family Services, Downey Fire Department, Downey Police Department, Drake, Peggy Lee Duffield, Molly Dwyer(a corrupt public employee), Molly Dwyer(an individual), Sarah Nicole Egar(an individual), Sarah Nicole Egar(RN), Douglas Emhoff(a corrupt attorney), Douglas Emhoff(as an individual), Kristin Emhoff, Angelina Endsley(an individual), Angelina Endsley(a corrupt public official), Joann Escasa-Haigh, Alice G. Estaville(an individual), Alice G. Estaville(an attorney), Jerome Farris(a corrupt Judge), Jerome Farris(an individual), Fed Ex, Maria Fernandez(an individual), Maria Fernandez(a corrupt public employee), Philip Fernandez(a corrupt cop), Philip Fernandez(an individual), Kristin Annabell Frantz, Freemason Organization, Brittney Gannon, Broderick Goens(corrupt cop), Broderick Goens(an individual), Kyle Goffney(corrupt cop), Kyle Goffney(an individual), Jackie Goldberg(a corrupt public official), Jackie Goldberg(an individual), Gustavo Gomez, Xiomara Selene Gomez, Juan Gonazlez, Kyle Gonzales(an individual), Kyle Gonzales(corrupt cop), Jose Gonzalez(corrupt public official), Jose Gonzalez(an individual), Juan Gonzalez, Google North America Inc, Google, LLC, Rick Graf, Lucian C Grainge, Chester F. Griffiths, Heriberto Guitierrez(an individual), Heriberto Guitierrez(corrupt cop), Maria Gutierrez(a corrupt public payroll clerk), Maria Gutierrez(an individual), Kamala Harris(in her official capacity), Kamala Harris(as an individual), Ronald Harris(corrupt cop), Ronald Harris(an individual), Scott Harris(in official capacity), Scott Harris(as an individual), Emma Hernandez(an individual), Emma Hernandez(a corrupt Public health nurse), Katelyn Michel Hicks(an individual), Katelyn Michel Hicks(RN), Yenny Hino(public official), Yenny Hino(an individual), Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian, Greg Hoffmann, Wayne Holbrook(an individual), Wayne Holbrook(corrupt cop), ID.ME, Inc, ID.ME, Inc., Edwin Thomas III Hoffmark(an individual), Edwin Thomas III Hoffmark(a corrupt public health nurse), Edwin Thomas III Hoffmark(RN), Bob Iger, Christa Indriolo(an individual), Christa Indriolo(corrupt labor rep), Andrew Jassy, Jay-Z, Dan Jedda, Breanna Reesing Johnson, Brianna Reesing Johnson(RN), Brianna Reesing Johnson(an individual), Nick Jones(as an individual), Nick Jones(in his official capacity), KRPM Investment Group Inc, Kaiser Permante, Craig Kallmann, James M Kapenstein, Beth Keely(public official), Beth Keely(an individual), Younjoo Lee Kim(RN), Younjoo Lee Kim(an individual), Amy Nichelle Knickerbocker(an individual), Amy Nichelle Knickerbocker(RN), Kristina Koukladas(an individual), Kristina Koukladas(a corrupt real estate), Paul Kranke(an individual), Paul Kranke(corrupt cop), Jacquelyn Phillips Lacey(corrupt public official), Jacquelyn Phillips Lacey(an individual), Jacquelyn Phillips Lacey(a corrupt attorney), Kristen Ann Lalanas, Jenny Lam(a corrupt labor rep), Jenny Lam(an individual), Edward Leavy(an individual), Edward Leavy(a corrupt Judge), Luke Leslie(an individual), Luke Leslie(a corrupt public official), Kristen Ann Llalanas, Pilar Dizon Llanes(an individual), Pilar Dizon Llanes(RN), Pilar Dizon Llanes(a corrut public official), Khozem Lokhandwala, Long Beach, Brandon Joseph Loop(RN), Brandon Joseph Loop(an individual), Lopez and Associates, Inc., Los Angeles County FIre Department, Los Angeles District Attorney Office, Los Angeles Unified School District, Lynwood Sheriff, Arturo Macias(an individual), Arturo Macias(corrupt cop), Keng Mak(corrupt labor rep), Keng Mak(an individual), Jazmina Mansury(an individual), Jazmina Mansury(a corrupt labor rep), Denice Martin(corrupt labor rep), Denice Martin(an individual), Gloria Martinez(an individual), Gloria Martinez(a corrupt labor rep), Antonio Masone, Brenda McCarthy(an individual), Brenda McCarthy(a corrupt public employee), Christine M McCarthy, Patrice McConnell, Brian McNamara(an individual), Brian McNamara(a corrupt labor rep), Memoral Healhcare, Michael M. Mendoza(corrupt cop), Michael M. Mendoza(an individual), MetroPCS, Brady Joseph Mitchell(an attorney), Brady Joseph Mitchell(an individual), Robert Mitchell, Morales, Gustavo Morales, Gabriel Moreno(as an individual), Gabriel Moreno(in official capacity with no-Defendants), Brian Morris, Brian Morris, Motion Picture and Televsion Fund, D. Mulligan(as an individual), D. Mulligan(Downey Chief of Police, in his official capacity), Isidro Munoz(corrupt cop), Isidro Munoz(an individual), Rupert Murdoch, Bruce T. Murray(a corrupt attorney), Bruce T. Murray(an individual), National Labor Relations Board, Navajo County, Navajo County Sheriff Department, Navajo Court Lakeside-Pinetop, Anita Nepomuceno(an individual), Anita Nepomuceno(a corrupt public official), Anita Nepomuceno(RN), Lisa Nesbitt(as an individual), Lisa Nesbitt(in official capacity), Steven O Newhouse, Gavin Newsom(an individual), Gavin Newsom(in official capacity), Carmel Anne Nicholls(RN), Carmel Anne Nicholls(an individual), Alicia Naomi Nishioka(an individual), Alicia Naomi Nishioka(RN), Norwalk Courthouse, Norwalk Registrar-Recorder Office, Norwalk Sheriff Department, Officer Badge 1424(an individual), Officer Badge 1424(corrupt police), Officer Badge 7728(an individual), Officer Badge 7728(a corrcut officer), Gary Olney(a CEO), Gary Olney(an individual), Alex Orozco(an individual), Alex Orozco(a corrupt labor rep), PIH Hospital, PRC Mult-Family LLC, Pacific Neuroscience Institute Medical Group, Inc, Maria Dolores Perez(RN), Maria Dolores Perez(an individual), Joanne Person(an individual), Joanne Person(a corrupt public health nurse), Sundar Pichai, Gabriel Pimental(an individual), Gabriel Pimental(a corrupt attorney), Danna Plancarte(jucial employee), Danna Plancarte(an individual), Patrick Plummer(an individual), Patrick Plummer(a corrupt public attorney), Kristin Poirier, Ryan Poirier(an individual), Ryan Poirier(a corrupt officer), Joseph D Preston, James Prince, Providence Health System Southern California, Providence Health and Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Anthony Darrell Quarles, Anthony Darrell Quarles, RCS Investigations and Consulting, LLC, Johnnie B. Rawlinson(a corrupt Judge), Johnnie B. Rawlinson(an individual), Wiiliam P. Ring, William P. Ring, Ring, LLC, Carrie Rios(an individual), Carrie Rios(a corrupt inspector public official), Rafael Rivero, Brian Roberts, Steve Rodig(an indivdual), Steve Rodig(an officer), Leonardo Rodriguez(in his official capacity), Leonardo Rodriguez(as an individual), Mori Pam Rubin(a corrupt public official), Mori Pam Rubin(a corrupt attorney), Mori Pam Rubin(an individual), Rumia Sagalia(an individual), Rumia Sagalia(a corrupt public official), Chris Sawyer(as an individual), Chris Sawyer(in official capacity), Scientology Organization, Lee Elizabeth Sibbald(RN), Lee Elizabeth Sibbald(an individual), Araceli Silva(an individual), Araceli Silva(a corrupt public official), Sony Corporation of America, South Gate Police Department, State of Arizona, State of Caliornia, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Washington, Khanh Thai(an individual), Khanh Thai(a corrupt public employee), The Walt Disney Company, Larry Tietgen(an individual), Larry Tietgen(a Fire Chief), Todd A Brisco and Associates, Mirjana Nichiporuk Tolt(an individual), Mirjana Nichiporuk Tolt(a corrupt attorney), Torrance Police Department, Trans National Amusements, Inc, Rhodora Tongol Tumamak(RN), Rhodora Tongol Tumamak(an individual), Twentieth Century Fox International Television, Inc, UCLA Health, United States Postal Service, United States of America, United Teachers of Los Angeles, Universal Music Group, Inc, Patricia Unknown(as an individual), Patricia Unknown(of Chris Sawyers and Clerks of the Court, in her offical capacity), Rose Unknown, Julie Valencia(a corrupt public official), Julie Valencia(an individual), Brian Humberto Vargas(an individual), Brian Humberto Vargas(RN), Jared Rees Vargas(RN), Jared Rees Vargas(an individual), Eli Gonzalez Villagomez, Maria Cecilia Virola(a corrupt public official), Maria Cecilia Virola(RN), Maria Cecilia Virola(an individual), Ted Wang(an individual), Ted Wang(CFO), Warner Music Group Corp, Maxine Waters, Rebekah Davi Webber(RN), Rebekah Davi Webber(an individual), James Weed, Jessica Wellman(RN), Jessica Wellman(an individual), Kanye West, West Covina Police Department, Colleen Wilcoxen(ACNO), Colleen Wilcoxen(an individual), Keaton Williams(deputy county attorney), Keaton Williams(an individual), Weston Allen Winn(RN), Weston Allen Winn(an individual), Brian Wolf(an attorney), Brian Wolf(an individual), George H. Wu(corrupt judge), George H. Wu(as an individual), Kenneth H. Yi, Craig Yokoi, Kenchiro Yoshida, Craig Yukoi, Amir Zia(a corrupt inspector public official), Amir Zia(an individual), Rochelle Reyes de Golier(a corrupt attorney), Rochelle Reyes de Golier(an individual).Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Lisa Maria Bernal. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2021: #2 Summons, #3 Order for US Marshall Service and Cost of Copies) (ghap). (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Providence St. Joseph Health Network is a litigant

Latest cases where Cushman & Wakefield of Pennsylvania, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN is a litigant

Latest cases where Jay-Z is a litigant