Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 10:10:29 (UTC).

Rey Bernabe et al v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Rey Bernabe filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11312

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kristine Joy Bernabe

Rubina Ann Bernabe

Rey Bernabe

Defendants

the Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated

Quest Diagnostics Incorporated

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corinne Chandler

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Glenn R Kantor

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Alan E Kassan

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Beth A Davis

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Keiko J Kojima

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #18 of Electronic Copy of the Administrative Record served on February 9, 2021. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America of Electronic Copy of the Administrative Record on CD. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#17

(#17) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan E Kassan on behalf of Plaintiffs Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe (Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Kristine Joy Bernabe(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Rey Bernabe(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Rubina Ann Bernabe(pty:pla))(Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 2/8/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/20/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Authorized Agent at C T Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susie Vang, Authorized Agent at CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Life Insurance Company of North America, Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, the Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (jtil) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #18 of Electronic Copy of the Administrative Record served on February 9, 2021. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America of Electronic Copy of the Administrative Record on CD. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan E Kassan on behalf of Plaintiffs Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe (Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Kristine Joy Bernabe(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Rey Bernabe(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Rubina Ann Bernabe(pty:pla))(Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 2/8/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/20/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Authorized Agent at C T Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susie Vang, Authorized Agent at CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Life Insurance Company of North America, Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, the Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (jtil) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kristine Joy Bernabe, Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe. (Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29530049 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Rey Bernabe, Rubina Ann Bernabe, Kristine Joy Bernabe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Kristine Joy Bernabe(pty:pla), Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Rey Bernabe(pty:pla), Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Rubina Ann Bernabe(pty:pla))(Chandler, Corinne) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quest Diagnostics Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keiko J Kojima

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Maguire