This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 08:32:55 (UTC).

Bermudez v. SN Servicing Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Bermudez filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SN Servicing Corp ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02116

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Omar Bermudez

Defendants

SN Servicing Corporation

US Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Igloo Series IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Paul Cara

Attorney at CDLG, PC

2973 Harbor Blvd., Suite 594

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorney

Rachel C. Witcher

Attorney at Ghidotti Berger, LLP

1920 Old Tustin Ave.

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/28/2022 GRANTING the Motion to Dismiss as to plaintiff's first, fourth and fifth claims with leave to amend; DENYING the Motion to Dismiss as to plaintiff's second and third claims; GRANTING the parties' Request to Consolidate; CONSOLIDATING 2:22-cv-01246-KJM-DB with 2:22-cv-02116-KJM-DB for all purposes, including trial; DENYING AS MOOT #6 Motion to Dismiss in 2:22-cv-02116-KJM-DB; and DIRECTING plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Case No. 2:22-cv-01246-KJM-DB shall be referenced in the caption of all pleadings, and all documents shall be filed in this case. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

7 #3

VDRP

7 #2

Consent Form

7 #1

Standing Order

7 #7

Main Document

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Request for Judicial Notice

6 #6

Main Document

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/29/2022 ORDERING that Case No. 2:22-cv-02116-DAD-AC is reassigned from District Judge Dale A. Drozd to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Allison Claire to Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:22-cv-2116-KJM-DB. Related case no. 2:22-cv-01246-KJM-DB. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

3 #3

Main Document

2 #3

VDRP

2 #2

Consent Form

2 #1

Standing Order

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Certificate of Interested Entities

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/10/2023: In light of the Order at ECF No. #8 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 1/27/2023 is VACATED. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/28/2022 GRANTING the Motion to Dismiss as to plaintiff's first, fourth and fifth claims with leave to amend; DENYING the Motion to Dismiss as to plaintiff's second and third claims; GRANTING the parties' Request to Consolidate; CONSOLIDATING 2:22-cv-01246-KJM-DB with 2:22-cv-02116-KJM-DB for all purposes, including trial; DENYING AS MOOT #6 Motion to Dismiss in 2:22-cv-02116-KJM-DB; and DIRECTING plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Case No. 2:22-cv-01246-KJM-DB shall be referenced in the caption of all pleadings, and all documents shall be filed in this case. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to DISMISS by SN Servicing Corporation, US Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Igloo Series IV. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Certificate of Service)(Witcher, Rachel) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:22-cv-2116-KJM-DB. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/29/2022 ORDERING that Case No. 2:22-cv-02116-DAD-AC is reassigned from District Judge Dale A. Drozd to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Allison Claire to Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:22-cv-2116-KJM-DB. Related case no. 2:22-cv-01246-KJM-DB. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-01246-KJM by SN Servicing Corporation, US Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Igloo Series IV. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Witcher, Rachel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00328300-CU-OR-GDS by SN Servicing Corporation, et al. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10565289) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Service)(Witcher, Rachel) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SN SERVICING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel C Witcher