This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2021 at 11:06:57 (UTC).

Bermudez et al v. Indemnity Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Bermudez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00889

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oscar Bermudez

SA Polo Inc

Defendants

Bryan Walton

Team One Adjusting Services, LLC

Indemnity Insurance Company of North America

Tin Top Insurance Agency, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Q Voyles

Attorney at Lubel Voyles LLP

675 Bering Dr., Suite 850

Houston, TX 77057

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Adam Quentin Voyles

Attorney at Lubel Voyles, LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia G Curran

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Dallas

3100 Commerica Bank Center, 1717 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Donnie Mike Apodaca, II

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main St., Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to Tin Top Insurance Agency, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Issued as to Team One Adjusting Services, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Bryan Walton. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Thursday, 3/4/2021, at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 2/17/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/13/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand by Oscar Bermudez. (Voyles, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Oscar Bermudez, SA Polo Inc (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03323. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/17/2020) (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case pending in the Eastern District of Texas filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Curran, Alicia) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11332923.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Curran, Alicia) Modified payment information on 11/6/2020 (hml). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to Tin Top Insurance Agency, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Issued as to Team One Adjusting Services, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Bryan Walton. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Thursday, 3/4/2021, at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 2/17/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/13/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand by Oscar Bermudez. (Voyles, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Oscar Bermudez, SA Polo Inc (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03323. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/17/2020) (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case pending in the Eastern District of Texas filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Curran, Alicia) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Limited for Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Curran, Alicia) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11332923.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Curran, Alicia) Modified payment information on 11/6/2020 (hml). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEAM ONE ADJUSTING SERVICE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donnie M Apodaca, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia G Curran