This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 08:19:59 (UTC).

Bermudez et al v. Indemnity Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Bermudez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03323

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oscar Bermudez

SA Polo, Inc.

SA Polo Inc

Defendants

Team One Adjusting Services LLC

Bryan Walton

Indemnity Insurance Company of North America

Tin Top Insurance Agency, LLC

Tin Top Insurance Agency LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Q Voyles

Attorney at Lubel Voyles LLP

675 Bering Dr., Suite 850

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia G Curran

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main St, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Donnie Mike Apodaca, II

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main St., Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/17/2020) (hml) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case pending in the Eastern District of Texas filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Limited for Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11332923.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Curran, Alicia) Modified payment information on 11/6/2020 (hml). (Entered: 11/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from NDTX has been opened in Eastern District of Texas as case number 4:20-cv-00889. (mjr) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketInterdistrict Transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. (hml) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/17/2020) (hml) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case pending in the Eastern District of Texas filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Limited for Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11332923.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Curran, Alicia) Modified payment information on 11/6/2020 (hml). (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEAM ONE ADJUSTING SERVICE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donnie M Apodaca, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia G Curran