This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:55:16 (UTC).

BERKOWITZ v. COOK INCORPORATED, et al.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BERKOWITZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon, Tim A. Baker and Richard L. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04805

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judges

James Patrick Hanlon

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Berkowitz

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED A/K/A COOK MEDICAL, INC.

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

COOK MEDICAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew F. Kirkendall

Attorney at KIRKENDALL DWYER LLP

4343 Sigma Road, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75244

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Kirkendall on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM BERKOWITZ. (Kirkendall, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4805-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/11/2019.(LBT) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Berkowitz. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5754140) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kirkendall, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#6) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:19-cv-04797-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04801-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04803-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04806-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04807-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04809-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 12/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04797-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04801-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04803-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04806-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04807-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04809-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/11/2019.(LBT) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Kirkendall on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM BERKOWITZ. (Kirkendall, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4805-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Berkowitz. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5754140) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kirkendall, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.