This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2019 at 08:01:02 (UTC).

Bergner v. Derr

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Bergner against Derr in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00593

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamie Bergner

Defendant

Abigail Derr

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Memorandum in Support

#10

(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Abigail Derr (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Howard, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

4 #3

Proposed Order

4 #2

Certificate of Good Standing - Hilliard

4 #1

Affidavit Hilliard

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-003360. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Abigail Derr from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003360. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2928423) filed by Abigail Derr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court) (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Abigail Derr (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Howard, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of email confirmation as to Christopher Schaefer re #9 Request for Fee Refund (MLG) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of email confirmation as to Christopher E. Schaefer re #8 Request for Fee Refund (MLG) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Fee Refund re #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, by Abigail Derr. (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Fee Refund re #1 Notice of Removal, by Abigail Derr. (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/20/2019. Defendant shall have up to and until 10/17/2019 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant does not waive any defenses or objections to this lawsuit, other than objections to the absence of a summons or of service of Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff will not claim that any such waiver has occurred.cc: Counsel (RLJ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Abigail Derr. (Howard, Lindsey) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/17/2019 granting #4 Motion re: Attorney Craig S. Hilliard. If during the pendency of this action, Craig S. Hilliard is disbarred, suspended from practice, is not in good standing with the Bar to which he is a member, or is subject to any other disciplinary action by any court, state, territory or the District of Columbia, Craig S. Hilliard must immediately notify the Court and provide information necessary for the Court to evaluate whether continued admission in this case is appropriate. cc: Counsel (RLJ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Craig S. Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2942758. by Defendant Abigail Derr (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hilliard, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Hilliard, #3 Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Christopher) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-003360. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Abigail Derr from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003360. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2928423) filed by Abigail Derr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court) (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.