This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 12:30:34 (UTC).

Bergeson v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On June 08,  2022, Carl Bergeson (“Plaintiff”), represented by Charles H. Johnson of Law Offices of Charles Johnson, PA, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Monsanto Company (“Monsanto” or “Defendant”), seeking compensatory damages, statutory damages, disgorgement and restitution for alleged negligent and wrongful conduct of Defendants. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota with Judges Eric C. Tostrud and Becky R. Thorson presiding. 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “this is an action for damages suffered by Plaintiff as a direct and proximate result of Defendant’s negligent and wrongful conduct in connection with the design, development, manufacture, testing, packaging, promoting, marketing, advertising, distribution, labeling, and/or sale of the herbicide Roundup, containing the active ingredient glyphosate.”

Plaintiff stated that “Glyphosate is the active ingredient in Roundup. Glyphosate is a broad-spectrum herbicide used to kill weeds and grasses known to compete with commercial crops grown around the globe. Glyphosate is a “non-selective” herbicide, meaning it kills indiscriminately based only on whether a given organism produces a specific enzyme, 5-enolpyruvylshikimic acid- 3-phosphate synthase, known as EPSP synthase.”

Plaintiff claimed that “Defendant is intimately involved in the development, design, manufacture, marketing, sale, and/or distribution of genetically modified (‘GMO’) crops, many of which are marketed as being resistant to Roundup i.e., ‘Roundup Ready®.’ As of 2009, Defendant was the world’s leading producer of seeds designed to be Roundup Ready®. In 2010, an estimated 70% of corn and cotton, and 90% of soybean fields in the United States contained Roundup Ready® seeds.”

Plaintiff alleged that “Roundup and/or glyphosate is defective, dangerous to human health, unfit and unsuitable to be marketed and sold in commerce, and lacked proper warnings and directions as to the dangers associated with its use.”

Plaintiff then alleged that “in the case of glyphosate and Roundup, the EPA had planned on releasing its preliminary risk assessment – in relation to the registration process – no later than July 2015. The EPA completed its review of glyphosate in early 2015, but delayed releasing the assessment pending further review in light of the World Health Organization’s findings.”

Plaintiff further alleged that “Plaintiff used Roundup in recreational gardening and lawncare for a significant portion of plaintiff’s life. Plaintiff followed all safety and precautionary warnings during the course of use. As a result of exposure to Roundup, Plaintiff developed lymphoma. Plaintiff was diagnosed with Lymphoma in May of 2019.”

Plaintiff presented four claims of relief alleging negligence, strict liability, failure to warn defective design and manufacture, and breach of implied warranties. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested equitable relief in disgorgement and restitution of remedy Defendant’s unjust enrichment. Plaintiff also requested compensatory damages, statutory damages and relief, and reasonable attorney fees, 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-01529

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carl A Bergeson

Carl Bergeson

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles H Johnson

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles H Johnson, PA

2599 Mississippi St

New Brighton, MN 55112

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MMG) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-337) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(kt) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • Docket(#7) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:22-cv-03826, filed 06/28/2022. (CLK) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of California. (kt) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-337) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(kt) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2741 re: #1 Complaint. (MMG) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MMG) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 22-cv-1529 ECT/BRT.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9561665) filed by Carl A Bergeson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles H. Johnson