This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:22:09 (UTC).

Berger v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Berger filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11175

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Israel Berger

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Citibank, N.A.

American Express Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

Raymond Alexander Garcia

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18223946)Document filed by Israel Berger.(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. American Express Co. served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Agent. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Citibank, N.A. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Emma Carlson, Agent. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#8

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint (on consent) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Raymond A. Garcia dated January 30, 2020. Document filed by American Express Co..(Garcia, Raymond) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (American Express Co. answer due 3/4/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/31/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (American Express Co. answer due 3/4/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/31/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint (on consent) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Raymond A. Garcia dated January 30, 2020. Document filed by American Express Co..(Garcia, Raymond) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. American Express Co. served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Agent. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Citibank, N.A. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Emma Carlson, Agent. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Israel Berger. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18223946)Document filed by Israel Berger.(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.