This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2023 at 09:42:06 (UTC).

Berger et al v. Advocate Mines, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 Berger filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Advocate Mines, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter D. Welte and Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter D. Welte

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Counter Defendants

Kelly Berger

Josephine Woodard

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

CBS Corporation

Ericsson Inc.

Riley Power, Inc.

Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp.

Advocate Mines, Ltd.

A.W. Chesterton Company

Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.

Atlas Turner, Inc.

Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd.

Bell & Gossett

Burnham, LLC

Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd.

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Cleaver-Brooks

Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.

Dakota Supply Group, Inc.

Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Inc.

Cable Corporation

Kelly Berger

Josephine Woodard

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

David C. Thompson

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joanna M. Salmen

Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten

Kyle B. Mansfield

Jason Mohr

Kristi K. Brownson

Joanna M. Salmen,

David C. Thompson

Other Attorneys

David D. Schweigert

Tyler Johnson Siewert

David T. Schach

Susan M. Hansen

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) Goodyear Canada Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Goodyear Canada, Ltd.. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#54

(#54) Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#53

(#53) Superior Essex, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Essex Group Inc.. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#52

(#52) Ericsson Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Ericsson Inc.. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#50

(#50) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Weil McLain Company. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#49

(#49) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#48

(#48) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/8/2023. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#47

(#47) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Essex Group Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/8/2023. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to General Electric Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/29/2023. (sc) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Josephine Woodard. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/29/2023. (sc) NEF regenerated to include counsel on 3/15/2023 (sc). (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kelly Berger. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/29/2023. (sc) NEF regenerated to include counsel on 3/15/2023 (sc). (Entered: 03/15/2023)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet with Exhibit A: North Dakota Service List to Include All Defen

1 #5

Affidavit of Service 3/14/2023

1 #4

Exhibit A: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

Exhibit 2: Service of Process of Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1: Order of Dismissal

#1

(#6) SUPPLEMENT Ex. 3 - Woodard Work History (redacted) to document: #1 Notice of Removal,, by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Goodyear Canada Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Goodyear Canada, Ltd.. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Superior Essex, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Essex Group Inc.. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Ericsson Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Ericsson Inc.. (Salmen, Joanna) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDeadlines Terminated. Consent/Reassignment Form deadlines as to Kelly Berger, Josephine Woodard, General Electric Company, Riley Power, Inc., Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd., Ericsson Inc., Essex Group Inc., and Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company are CANCELLED in light of ORDER REASSIGNING CASE at 51 . (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Docket(#51) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Weil McLain Company. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/8/2023. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Essex Group Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/8/2023. (pb) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd. and Weil McLain Company. (Issued per request of plaintiff.) (sc) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/5/2023. (mf) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp... (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service via Email and U.S. Mail)(Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENT Ex. 3 - Woodard Work History (redacted) to document: #1 Notice of Removal,, by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Docket(#5) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The Clerk is directed to seal Doc. 1-3 because it includes personally identifying information. Counsel is directed to file a redacted version within three business days. (AS) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to General Electric Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/29/2023. (sc) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Josephine Woodard. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/29/2023. (sc) NEF regenerated to include counsel on 3/15/2023 (sc). (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kelly Berger. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/29/2023. (sc) NEF regenerated to include counsel on 3/15/2023 (sc). (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company from Cass County District Court. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 100000914 filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order of Dismissal, #2 Exhibit 2: Service of Process of Summons and Complaint, #3 *SEALED* Exhibit 3: Dannis Woodard Work History, #4 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Affidavit of Service 3/14/2023, #6 Civil Cover Sheet with Exhibit A: North Dakota Service List to Include All Defendants)(sc) Modified to correct filer on 3/15/2023. NEF regenerated (sc). Modified to restrict access to attachment per Order at 5 on 3/15/2023. NEF regenerated (sc) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less