This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:34:20 (UTC).

Berg v. Walmart Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Berg filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00450

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Berg

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC

Walmart Inc

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC doing business as Walmart #5480

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Area Continental SAB de CV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John K Ivey

Attorney at Lee Gober & Reyna

11940 Jollyville Rd, Suite 220-S

Austin, TX 78759

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Hoffman Bruce

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Jillian van Rensburg Keith

Attorney at Wilson Elser Mosowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4800

Dallas, TX 75202

Amanda Anne Saputo

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

901 Main Street, Suite 4800

Dallas, TX 75231

Stacy Hoffman Bruce,

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12623803) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 (a-o), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 (a-o)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC. (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Walmart re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart, Inc. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Patricia Berg (Ivey, John) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

6 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Patricia Berg (Ivey, John) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Walmart re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart, Inc. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC. (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12623803) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 (a-o), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE COCA-COLA COMPANY is a litigant