This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2020 at 07:15:42 (UTC).

Bentrup v. Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 Bentrup filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03413

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amber Bentrup

Defendant

Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary James Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

111 W. Jackson, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Young Keun Kim

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.c.

321 N. Clark St., Ste. 1000

Chicago, IL 60654

Barry A. Hartstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's unopposed extension motion to file status report #9 is granted to 08/14/2020, in light of the 08/10/2020 answer deadline. The status hearing of 07/23/2020 is reset to 08/21/2020 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will review the status report and set the discovery schedule. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion by Barry A. Hartstein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #9 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/13/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. for extension of time to file Joint Status Report (Unopposed) (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. by Daniel Young Keun Kim (Kim, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. by Barry A. Hartstein (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amber Bentrup. Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

4 #1

Status Report Requirements

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 07/23/2020 at 9:15 a.m. If held, the initial status hearing will be held telephonically. The parties shall provide a contact number to the courtroom deputy (Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by 1:00 p.m. on the prior business day. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 07/14/2020. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 06/28/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Bentrup by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Amber Bentrup; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17099049. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's unopposed extension motion to file status report #9 is granted to 08/14/2020, in light of the 08/10/2020 answer deadline. The status hearing of 07/23/2020 is reset to 08/21/2020 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will review the status report and set the discovery schedule. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Motion by Barry A. Hartstein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #9 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/13/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. for extension of time to file Joint Status Report (Unopposed) (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. by Daniel Young Keun Kim (Kim, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. by Barry A. Hartstein (Hartstein, Barry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amber Bentrup. Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 07/23/2020 at 9:15 a.m. If held, the initial status hearing will be held telephonically. The parties shall provide a contact number to the courtroom deputy (Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by 1:00 p.m. on the prior business day. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 07/14/2020. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 06/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Willis, Gia) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Bentrup by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Amber Bentrup; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17099049. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less