This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2020 at 07:12:58 (UTC).

Benton v. North Central AG LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Benton filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against North Central AG LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02956

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William G. Benton, II

Defendants

ADP, LLC

North Central AG LLC

Polen Implement Inc.

ADP TotalSource Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul J. Corrado

Attorney at Law Office of Paul J. Corrado

24700 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Michael T. Schroth

Attorney at Ste. B

36368 Detroit Road

Avon, OH 44011

Defendant Attorneys

Mark B. Gerano

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - Cincinnati

26Th Floor, 201 East Fifth Street, Pnc Center

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Patricia Anderson Pryor

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - Cincinnati

26Th Floor, 201 East Fifth Street, Pnc Center

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by North Central AG LLC. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ADP TotalSource Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ADP, LLC. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#10

(#10) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by North Central AG LLC, Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#9

(#9) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by ADP TotalSource Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#8

(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by ADP, LLC. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance of Mark B. Gerano by Patricia Anderson Pryor filed by on behalf of ADP TotalSource Inc., ADP, LLC, North Central AG LLC, Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Unopposed Motion for extension of time for 14 days to answer filed by ADP TotalSource Inc., ADP, LLC, North Central AG LLC, Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#4

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon ADP TotalSource Inc. on 1/15/2020; ADP, LLC on 1/15/2020; Polen Implement Inc. on 1/15/2020, filed on behalf of William G. Benton, II Related document(s) #4 . (J,FE) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

3 #4

Summons Summons to ADP TotalSource, Inc.

3 #3

Summons Summons to ADP, LLC

3 #2

Summons Summons to North Central AG, LLC

3 #1

Summons Summons to Polen Implement, Inc.

#3

(#3) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by William G. Benton, II. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Polen Implement, Inc., #2 Summons to North Central AG, LLC, #3 Summons to ADP, LLC, #4 Summons to ADP TotalSource, Inc.)(Schroth, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by ADP, LLC. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by North Central AG LLC. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ADP TotalSource Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ADP, LLC. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by North Central AG LLC, Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by ADP TotalSource Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by ADP, LLC. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance of Mark B. Gerano by Patricia Anderson Pryor filed by on behalf of ADP TotalSource Inc., ADP, LLC, North Central AG LLC, Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document]granting Defendants' #6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer. ADP TotalSource Inc., ADP, LLC, North Central AG LLC, and Polen Implement Inc. answers due 2/19/2020.. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/6/2020.(R,Sh) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for extension of time for 14 days to answer filed by ADP TotalSource Inc., ADP, LLC, North Central AG LLC, Polen Implement Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon ADP TotalSource Inc. on 1/15/2020; ADP, LLC on 1/15/2020; Polen Implement Inc. on 1/15/2020, filed on behalf of William G. Benton, II Related document(s) #4 . (J,FE) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to ADP TotalSource Inc. (7794), ADP, LLC, North Central AG LLC (2712), Polen Implement Inc.(2705) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70150640000652707787. (J,FE) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon ADP TotalSource Inc., ADP, LLC, North Central AG LLC, Polen Implement Inc. (S,SR) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by William G. Benton, II. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Polen Implement, Inc., #2 Summons to North Central AG, LLC, #3 Summons to ADP, LLC, #4 Summons to ADP TotalSource, Inc.)(Schroth, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9692352. Filed by William G. Benton, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Corrado, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where ADP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADP TotalSource Inc. is a litigant