This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 08:14:58 (UTC).

Benton et al v. Crane Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Benton filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Crane Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01150

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Derryl J Benton

Lillie Benton

Defendants

Crosby Valve, Inc.

Crane Company

Flowserve U.S., Inc.

General Gasket Corporation

J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.

Mueller Co. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erin Lyn Beavers

Attorney at THE GORI LAW FIRM

156 N. Main St.

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Sara M. Salger

Attorney at THE GORI LAW FIRM P.C.

156 N. Main St.

Edwardsville, IL 62025

David W. Aubrey

Attorney at THE GORI LAW FIRM

156 N. Main St.

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Brandan P. Mueller

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP - St Louis

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Joseph C. Orlet

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP - St Louis

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Shannon David Peters

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP - St Louis

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Mary A. Hatch

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX PC - St Louis

600 Washington Ave., 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Agota Peterfy

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Albert J. Bronsky

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ENTRY of Appearance by David W. Aubrey for Plaintiff Derryl J Benton. (Aubrey, David) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#18

(#18) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (LNJ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#17

(#17) ENTRY of Appearance by Agota Peterfy for Defendant General Gasket Corporation. (Peterfy, Agota) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant General Gasket Corporation.. (Bronsky, Albert) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#15

(#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Defendant General Gasket Corporation. (Bronsky, Albert) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.. Parent companies: Flowserve Corp., Subsidiaries: Non, Publicly held company: Flowserve Corp.,. (Hatch, Mary) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#12

(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Mary A. Hatch for Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.. (Hatch, Mary) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Crosby Valve, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Mueller, Brandan) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

#2

1 #6

Attachment Pending Motions

1 #5

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ENTRY of Appearance by David W. Aubrey for Plaintiff Derryl J Benton. (Aubrey, David) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (LNJ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENTRY of Appearance by Agota Peterfy for Defendant General Gasket Corporation. (Peterfy, Agota) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant General Gasket Corporation.. (Bronsky, Albert) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Defendant General Gasket Corporation. (Bronsky, Albert) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#14) Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Sara M. Salger. Review of case shows that Attorney Sara M. Salger is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JWD) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.. Parent companies: Flowserve Corp., Subsidiaries: Non, Publicly held company: Flowserve Corp.,. (Hatch, Mary) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Mary A. Hatch for Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.. (Hatch, Mary) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Crosby Valve, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Mueller, Brandan) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#10) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs Derryl J Benton, Lillie Benton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BAK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.. (BAK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Mueller Co. LLC.(BAK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Crosby Valve, Inc..(BAK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by General Gasket Corporation.(BAK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lillie Benton, Derryl J Benton.(BAK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Crosby Valve, Inc.. Parent companies: The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC and Emerson Electric Co., Publicly held company: The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC and Emerson Electric Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Brandan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Crosby Valve, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Mueller, Brandan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 2122-CC08021, with receipt number AMOEDC-8884729, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Crosby Valve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Attachment Pending Motions)(Mueller, Brandan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP Bushnell Packing Supply Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where MUELLER CO. LTD. L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where CROSBY VALVE LLC (DOE 5) is a litigant