This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2019 at 08:42:11 (UTC).

Benton & Centeno LLP v. Clarke et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 Benton Centeno LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Clarke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci G Cornelius. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01317

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci G Cornelius

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benton & Centeno LLP

Defendants

Ana M Clarke

Thomas M Clarke

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee R Benton

Attorney at BENTON & CENTENO LLP

2019 3Rd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benton & Centeno LLP. Ana M Clarke served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benton & Centeno LLP. Thomas M Clarke served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Ana M Clarke, Thomas M Clarke. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benton & Centeno LLP.(MRR, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benton & Centeno LLP. Ana M Clarke served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benton & Centeno LLP. Thomas M Clarke served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Benton, Lee) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Ana M Clarke, Thomas M Clarke. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412871 (ALND B4601099903 related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benton & Centeno LLP.(MRR, ). (Benton, Lee) Modified on 8/16/2019 (KEK). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benton & Centeno LLP.(MRR, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.