This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:12:21 (UTC).

Bento v. Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Bento filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles S. Haight, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01394

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles S. Haight, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Bento

Defendant

Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jill Raymond Saluck

Attorney at Saluck Halper & Lehrman PLLC

10 Mortar Rock Rd.

Westport, CT 06880

Defendant Attorneys

Kuuku Minnah-Donkoh

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

1 Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Regen O'Malley

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-CT

95 Glastonbury Boulevard, Suite 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Exhibit Complaint

14 #1

Affidavit Kuuku Minnah-Donkoh Declaration in support

#14

(#14) Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted filed by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kuuku Minnah-Donkoh Declaration in support, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Minnah-Donkoh, Kuuku) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc..Responses due by 12/3/2020 (Minnah-Donkoh, Kuuku) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

11 #2

Affidavit Affidavit SC & Cert of Good Standing

11 #1

Affidavit Affidavit KMD & Cert of Good Standing

#11

(#11) MOTION for Attorney(s) Kuuku Minnah-Donkoh and Sebastian Clarkin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6164174) by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit KMD & Cert of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit SC & Cert of Good Standing)(O'Malley, Regen) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/12/2020 to Plead #1 Complaint by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.. (O'Malley, Regen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Regen O'Malley on behalf of Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. (O'Malley, Regen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Bento. Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Raymond Saluck on behalf of Anthony Bento (Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jill Raymond Saluck* *Saluck Halper & Lehrman PLLC* *75 S. Broadway Ste 400* *White Plains, NY 10601*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Bento, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 09/16/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 09/16/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2020 Discovery due by 3/19/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2021 Signed by Clerk on 09/17/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 9/17/2020 corrected file date (Nuzzi, Tiffany). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6099871.), filed by Anthony Bento.(Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, Plaintiff's #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Briefing Deadlines. Accordingly, the Court hereby extends Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's #13 Motion to Dismiss to on or before December 24, 2020, and Defendant's deadline to reply to Plaintiff's response to on or before January 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on November 14, 2020. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 11/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted until December 3, 2020 by Anthony Bento. (Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted filed by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kuuku Minnah-Donkoh Declaration in support, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Minnah-Donkoh, Kuuku) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc..Responses due by 12/3/2020 (Minnah-Donkoh, Kuuku) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kuuku Minnah-Donkoh and Sebastian Clark. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Attorney(s) Kuuku Minnah-Donkoh and Sebastian Clarkin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6164174) by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit KMD & Cert of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit SC & Cert of Good Standing)(O'Malley, Regen) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. to 11/12/2020. (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendant's #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, absent opposition and for good cause shown. Therefore, Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before November 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on October 12, 2020. (Marienko, A.) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/12/2020 to Plead #1 Complaint by Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.. (O'Malley, Regen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Regen O'Malley on behalf of Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. (O'Malley, Regen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Bento. Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Raymond Saluck on behalf of Anthony Bento (Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jill Raymond Saluck* *Saluck Halper & Lehrman PLLC* *75 S. Broadway Ste 400* *White Plains, NY 10601*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Bento, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 09/16/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 09/16/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2020 Discovery due by 3/19/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2021 Signed by Clerk on 09/17/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 9/17/2020 corrected file date (Nuzzi, Tiffany). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketJudge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to The Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc.. (Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Aluminum Finishing Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6099871.), filed by Anthony Bento.(Saluck, Jill) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less