This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:42:00 (UTC).

Bentley et al v. USM Acquisition, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Bentley filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against USM Acquisition, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zachary Bentley

Troy Ladehoff

Defendants

Premier Surfaces, Inc.

Premier Surfaces Acquisition, LLC

Clio Holdings, LLC

USM Acquisition LLC

Custom Premier Surfaces, Inc.

Top Master Acquisition

USM Acquisition, LLC

Premier Surfaces Inc.

Tyron of GA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C. Philo

Attorney at Maurice & Jane Sugar Law Center

4605 Cass Ave., 2Nd Fl.

Detroit, MI 48201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zachary Bentley, Troy Ladehoff (Philo, John) Modified text and filers on 1/13/2020 (ems). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Zachary Bentley (Philo, John) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Clio Holdings, LLC, Custom Premier Surfaces, Inc., Top Master Acquisition, Tyron of GA, Inc., USM Acquisition, LLC (none provided) (ems) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zachary Bentley, Troy Ladehoff (Philo, John) Modified text and filers on 1/13/2020 (ems). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Clio Holdings, LLC, Custom Premier Surfaces, Inc., Premier Surfaces Acquisition, LLC, Premier Surfaces Inc., USM Acquisition, LLC (none provided) (ems) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Zachary Bentley in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4771121 (Philo, John) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Zachary Bentley (Philo, John) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.