This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:28:58 (UTC).

Bentley et al v. The Control Group Media Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Bentley filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against The Control Group Media Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw and Ruben B. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02437

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Ruben B. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vincent Hardy

Christopher Bentley

Hendry Idar, III

Nicholas Longo

Taryn Mitchell

Jesus Sanchez

Defendants

The Control Group Media Company, Inc.

Instant Checkmate, LLC

TruthFinders, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie Renee Tatar

Attorney at Tatar Law Firm, APC

3500 West Olive Ave., Ste. 300

Burbank, CA 91505

Thomas J. Lyons, Jr

Attorney at Consumer Justice Center P.A.

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Thomas J. Lyons, Jr., re #3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/30/2019.(rmc) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13313403.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lyons, Thomas) (rmc). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc., TruthFinders, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13289426.), filed by Taryn Mitchell, Nicholas Longo, Vincent Hardy, Jesus Sanchez, Christopher Bentley, Hendry Idar, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02437-DMS-RBB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Tatar, Stephanie)(vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Thomas J. Lyons, Jr., re #3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/30/2019.(rmc) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13313403.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lyons, Thomas) (rmc). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc., TruthFinders, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13289426.), filed by Taryn Mitchell, Nicholas Longo, Vincent Hardy, Jesus Sanchez, Christopher Bentley, Hendry Idar, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02437-DMS-RBB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Tatar, Stephanie)(vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Control Group Media Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where INSTANT CHECK MATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie R Tatar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J Lyons, Jr